Global Patent Index - EP 1172548 A3

EP 1172548 A3 2002-09-25 - Silencer for intake and/or exhaust in respect of compressed air systems

Title (en)

Silencer for intake and/or exhaust in respect of compressed air systems

Title (de)

Schalldämpfer für den Ein- und/oder Ablass in bzw. aus Druckluftsystemen

Title (fr)

Silencieux d'admission et/ou d'échappement d'un système d'air comprimé

Publication

EP 1172548 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01115537 A

Priority

DE 10034243 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1172548A2] Muffler (1) for muffling the intake noise of compressors and/or for muffling discharge noise from compressed air systems comprises baffle plates (6) arranged inside the muffler which run at an angle ( alpha ) of between 45 and 70 degrees to the basic flow direction and force air flowing through to follow a meandering course. Preferred Features: The baffle plates are parallel. Air-permeable, open-pored foamed material (3) is positioned near the low-pressure opening (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/12; F01N 1/08; F01N 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 1/08 (2006.01); F01N 13/00 (2010.01); F02M 35/12 (2006.01); F04B 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/007 (2013.01); F01N 1/082 (2013.01); F01N 1/083 (2013.01); F02M 35/1211 (2013.01); F02M 35/1233 (2013.01); F02M 35/1272 (2013.01); F04B 39/0061 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1172548 A2 20020116; EP 1172548 A3 20020925; DE 10034243 A1 20020131; DE 10034243 B4 20051110

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031104

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030325

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02M 35/12 A, 7F 01N 1/08 B, 7F 01N 7/00 B

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI