Global Patent Index - EP 1173628 B1

EP 1173628 B1 2002-09-25 - IRON-NICKEL ALLOY

Title (en)

IRON-NICKEL ALLOY

Title (de)

EISEN-NICKEL-LEGIERUNG

Title (fr)

ALLIAGE FER-NICKEL

Publication

EP 1173628 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00905008 A

Priority

  • DE 19920144 A
  • EP 0000840 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19920144C1] Iron-nickel alloy having a thermal expansion coefficient of less than 0.6 x 10<-6>/K at 20-100 deg C and a specified composition is used for shadow masks and frame parts of screens, passive components of thermo-bimetals, in the production, storage and transport of liquefied gases or for components of laser technology. The iron-nickel alloy contains up to 0.009 carbon, up to 0.1 manganese, up to 0.1 silicon, up to 0.1 aluminum, 0.5-2.0 cobalt, 35.0-36.0 nickel and a balance of iron

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/105 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19920144 C1 20000803; CN 1110576 C 20030604; CN 1348508 A 20020508; EP 1173628 A1 20020123; EP 1173628 B1 20020925; HK 1045718 A1 20031017; JP 2002543291 A 20021217; TW 524861 B 20030321; WO 0066802 A1 20001109

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VDM METALS INTERNATIONAL GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VDM METALS GMBH, 58791 WERDOHL, DE

- Document: DE 50000570

2016-07-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50000570

- Representative's name: CICHY, WOLFGANG, DIPL.-ING., DE

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-09-02 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150901

2014-07-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VDM METALS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OUTOKUMPU VDM GMBH, 58791 WERDOHL, DE

- Document: DE 50000570

- Effective date: 20140526

2014-07-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VDM METALS INTERNATIONAL GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OUTOKUMPU VDM GMBH, 58791 WERDOHL, DE

- Document: DE 50000570

- Effective date: 20140526

2014-07-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50000570

- Representative's name: CICHY, WOLFGANG, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20140526

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140221

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50000570

- Representative's name: CICHY, WOLFGANG, DIPL.-ING., DE

2014-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OUTOKUMPU VDM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: THYSSENKRUPP VDM GMBH, 58791 WERDOHL, DE

- Document: DE 50000570

- Effective date: 20130221

2013-04-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VDM METALS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: THYSSENKRUPP VDM GMBH, 58791 WERDOHL, DE

- Document: DE 50000570

- Effective date: 20130221

2013-04-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: VDM METALS INTERNATIONAL GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: THYSSENKRUPP VDM GMBH, 58791 WERDOHL, DE

- Document: DE 50000570

- Effective date: 20130221

2013-04-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50000570

- Representative's name: CICHY, WOLFGANG, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20130221

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-08-22 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1173628E

2003-01-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP VDM GMBH

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000570 20021031

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-10-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-10-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP VDM GMBH

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020315

2002-01-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010821

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE