Global Patent Index - EP 1173644 A4

EP 1173644 A4 2003-06-25 - STRUCTURAL SYSTEM OF TORSION/TOROIDAL ELEMENTS AND METHODS OF CONSTRUCTION THEREWITH

Title (en)

STRUCTURAL SYSTEM OF TORSION/TOROIDAL ELEMENTS AND METHODS OF CONSTRUCTION THEREWITH

Title (de)

STRUKTURELLES SYSTEM AUS TORSIONS-/TOROIDALEN ELEMENTEN UND KONSTRUKTIONSMETHODEN MIT DIESEM SYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME STRUCTUREL D'ELEMENTS DE TORSION/TOROIDAUX ET PROCEDES DE CONSTRUCTION AVEC CELUI-CI

Publication

EP 1173644 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00918149 A

Priority

  • US 0007338 W
  • US 27666599 A
  • US 27666699 A
  • US 30798599 A
  • US 31426799 A
  • US 31451699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0058575A1] The present invention is a structural system of torsion/toroidal elements (184, figure 84) that can be connected to form structures with greater structural strength and efficiency, and which have the capacity to bear compression, tension and flexion loading by conversion of such loading to torsion loading of the connected torsion/toroidal elements. The present invention also includes method of construction using torsion/toroidal elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/38; B25G 3/38; E04B 1/344

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/19 (2006.01); B60C 19/00 (2006.01); E04B 1/32 (2006.01); E04B 1/34 (2006.01); E04B 1/35 (2006.01); E04B 1/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/35 (2013.01); E04B 1/32 (2013.01); E04B 1/34 (2013.01); E04B 2001/3241 (2013.01); E04B 2001/3276 (2013.01); E04B 2001/3288 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0058575 A1 20001005; WO 0058575 B1 20001130; AP 1751 A 20070629; AP 200102280 A0 20010930; AT 522673 T 20110915; AU 3901200 A 20001016; AU 770845 B2 20040304; BR 0010775 A 20030715; CA 2367090 A1 20001005; CA 2367090 C 20120214; CN 1142348 C 20040317; CN 1345393 A 20020417; EA 003037 B1 20021226; EA 200101004 A1 20020425; EP 1173644 A1 20020123; EP 1173644 A4 20030625; EP 1173644 B1 20110831; JP 2002541360 A 20021203; MX PA01009703 A 20030624; NZ 514075 A 20031031; OA 11921 A 20060412

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170320

2018-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170331

2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171003

2017-12-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20171130

2017-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170320

2017-10-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60046403

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120320

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111211

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120320

2013-01-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2012-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2012-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-09-27 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60046403

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-06-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-03-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-02-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-02-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-02-15 [REG AT MK05] REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT

- Document: AT 522673 T

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-12-28 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-11-03 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60046403

- Effective date: 20111103

2011-09-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2011-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2011-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-08-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2011-08-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PROVITOLA, ANTHONY I.

2011-08-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PROVITOLA, ANTHONY I.

2011-03-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: STRUCTURAL SYSTEM OF TORSION/TOROIDAL ELEMENTS

2007-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030829

2006-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030829

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030829

2003-06-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030509

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04B 1/38 A

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 25G 3/38 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04B 1/344 B

2002-01-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011018

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI