Global Patent Index - EP 1174075 A3

EP 1174075 A3 2002-09-25 - Filtering unit for dishwasher

Title (en)

Filtering unit for dishwasher

Title (de)

Filter für einer Geschirrspülmaschine

Title (fr)

Filtre pour lave-vaisselle

Publication

EP 1174075 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01202686 A

Priority

IT MI20001623 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1174075A2] A filtering unit for dishwasher is described which comprises a first wide mesh filter (2) arranged on the bottom of a washing tank (3) of said dishwasher so as to collect and to filter the washing water contained in said tank (3), a second narrow mesh filter (6) arranged around the first filter (2) in order to carry out an additional filtering of said washing water, a tray (7) for the collection of the filtered washing water. Between the first filter (2) and the second filter (6) a third intermediate mesh filter (4) is arranged in order to carry out another filtering of the washing water before this reaches the second filter (6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4208 (2013.01); A47L 15/4206 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1174075 A2 20020123; EP 1174075 A3 20020925; EP 1174075 B1 20040512; DE 60103214 D1 20040617; DE 60103214 T2 20050504; ES 2215850 T3 20041016; IT 1318186 B1 20030723; IT MI20001623 A1 20020118; IT MI20001623 D0 20000718

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170929

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170706

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170802

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050215

2005-05-04 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-12-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2215850 T3

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60103214 P 20040617

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030606

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI