Global Patent Index - EP 1174380 A3

EP 1174380 A3 2002-11-27 - Bobbin changing arrangement

Title (en)

Bobbin changing arrangement

Title (de)

Spulenwechseleinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de changement de bobines

Publication

EP 1174380 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01117447 A

Priority

DE 20012778 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1174380A2] The bobbin change system (1), at a bobbin winder for one or more bobbins, has a static lifting doffer (4) at each winding station (2). It has a bobbin change unit (15). An elevated conveyor (5) at the winding station(s) carries off the bobbins (3). The bobbin change system, at a bobbin winder, has a lifting guide (10) near the access zone (9) to the bobbin winder, with a floating slide (12) and a lifting drive (11). At least a part of the bobbin change unit is mounted to the slide. The bobbin changer has a push unit (17) at the winder, to transfer a bobbin to a bobbin holder (18) at the slide. The slide has a push unit (16) to transfer the bobbin to the conveyor. A bobbin sleeve exchange unit (19) is at the slide, with a magazine for empty bobbin sleeves. The conveyor is a monorail, with a guide rail (22) for a number of trolleys (23) each with one or more bobbin holders (24). A safety screen is at the access zone of each winding station, with a rigid barrier and a controlled door, coupled to the doffer. The bobbin change system has a number of doffers, with a common conveyor and a common control. The control is also linked to the bobbin change system and the safety barrier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 67/04; B65H 54/72; B65H 67/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/72 (2006.01); B65H 67/04 (2006.01); B65H 67/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/72 (2013.01); B65H 67/0405 (2013.01); B65H 67/064 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20012778 U1 20011122; DE 50109598 D1 20060601; EP 1174380 A2 20020123; EP 1174380 A3 20021127; EP 1174380 B1 20060426

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090719

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *AUTEFA AUTOMATION G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080723

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060426

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080726

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080705

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070309

2007-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070129

2007-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-06-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50109598 P 20060601

2006-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040407

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI

2003-07-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030527

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 67/04 A, 7B 65H 67/06 B, 7B 65H 54/72 B

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI