Global Patent Index - EP 1174578 A3

EP 1174578 A3 2002-11-27 - Window or door frame with a device for connecting two section members

Title (en)

Window or door frame with a device for connecting two section members

Title (de)

Fenster- oder Türrahmen mit einer Vorrichtung zum Verbinden zweier Profilleisten

Title (fr)

Cadre de fenêtre ou de porte avec un dispositif pour relier deux profilés

Publication

EP 1174578 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01116725 A

Priority

DE 10034914 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1174578A2] The connection, to link together the profiled bars of window/door frames, uses an opening (56) in a wall (36) of one metal profiled bar (30). The second metal profiled bar (32) has an end side (58) at the first bar, with a plastics holder which is clamped by a tightened bolt (62) through the wall opening and pulls the second bar against the first.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/964; E06B 3/96

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/964 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/9642 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1174578 A2 20020123; EP 1174578 A3 20021127; EP 1174578 B1 20050504; AT 294915 T 20050515; DE 10034914 A1 20020207; DE 10034914 B4 20050901

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160718

2017-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160718

2017-04-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-04-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 294915 T

- Effective date: 20160718

2017-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50106077

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150728

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150716

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150729

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-04-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060207

2005-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50106077 P 20050609

2005-06-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-05-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030819

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030128

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI