Global Patent Index - EP 1174616 A3

EP 1174616 A3 2003-06-04 - Radial piston hydraulic motor/pump

Title (en)

Radial piston hydraulic motor/pump

Title (de)

Radialkolbenpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à piston radial

Publication

EP 1174616 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01117342 A

Priority

IT VI20000158 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1174616A2] Deals with a radial piston hydraulic motor/pump, where the alternating linear motion of the pistons takes place on a plane perpendicular to the shaft of the pump; such a dual-function machine (motor/pump) consists of a rotor containing a star of cylinders, a flow distributor and a reaction ring or stator, on which rest the upper ends of the pistons which slide inside the cylinders mentioned above. The finding is characterised in that its fixed distributor plate is in hydrodynamic equilibrium, or hydrobalanced, being completely washed, under functioning conditions, with a film of pressurised fluid. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/04; F04B 1/107

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/04 (2006.01); F04B 1/107 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/1071 (2013.01); F04B 1/0465 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1174616 A2 20020123; EP 1174616 A3 20030604; IT 1315479 B1 20030218; IT VI20000158 A1 20020121; IT VI20000158 D0 20000721

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031205

2004-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI