Global Patent Index - EP 1174899 A3

EP 1174899 A3 2002-09-18 - Electron source device

Title (en)

Electron source device

Title (de)

Elektronenquellenvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour source d'électrons

Publication

EP 1174899 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01306009 A

Priority

US 61787600 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1174899A2] A self-aligned electron device (10) includes emitter (13), extraction electrode (17), and focus electrode (21) separated by dielectric layers, (11, 15, 19). A single cavity (23) extending through the electrodes and the dielectric layers and terminating at the emitter electrode (13) is formed by a single photolithography step and an etching process. A composite emitter (1) including a base (3) disposed on the emitter electrode (13) and a conical tip (5) disposed on the base (3) and terminating at a vertex V is formed in the cavity (23). The base (3) can be made from materials including titanium, chromium, or doped silicon. The tip (5) can be made from a wide variety of materials including a refractory metal, a metal alloy, a silicon alloy, a carbide, a nitride, or an electroformable metal. The cavity (23) and the composite emitter (1) are self-aligned relative to each other. The dielectric layers can be etched back to reduce or eliminate charge accumulation on cavity-facing portions (43, 45) of the dielectric layers. A composite layer including a dielectric and mechanical strength enhancement layer (15a, 19a) of silicon nitride or silicon carbide and a pull-back layer (15b, 19b) of silicon oxide on top of the etch stop layer can be used to form the dielectric layers. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/04 (2006.01); H01J 1/304 (2006.01); H01J 3/02 (2006.01); H01J 31/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 3/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1174899 A2 20020123; EP 1174899 A3 20020918; CN 1334582 A 20020206; JP 2002083555 A 20020322

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-01 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060109

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040517

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030318

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI