EP 1174900 A1 20020123 - Pumping tube for flat display panel
Title (en)
Pumping tube for flat display panel
Title (de)
Pumprohr für flache Anzeigevorrichtung
Title (fr)
Tube d'évacuation pour panneau d'affichage plat
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 00402030 A 20000717
Abstract (en)
The invention proposes a pumping tube shape which makes it possible, on the one hand, to guide the pumping tube (23) when positioning the latter on the tile (25) and when producing the seal (24) by heating and, on the other hand, to prevent runs inside the pumping hole. Moreover, the pumping tube (23) of the invention makes it possible to produce an almost ideally distributed homogeneous seal (24), thereby ensuring that the latter seals reliably. The invention also relates to a plasma display panel having the pumping tube (23) of the invention. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
H01J 7/22 (2006.01); H01J 9/385 (2006.01); H01J 11/10 (2012.01); H01J 11/54 (2012.01); H01J 17/16 (2006.01); H01J 17/49 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
H01J 7/22 (2013.01); H01J 9/385 (2013.01); H01J 11/10 (2013.01); H01J 11/54 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [XY] US 3821584 A 19740628 - SCOVRONEK J
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 05 31 May 1999 (1999-05-31)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 001, no. 119 (E - 052) 11 October 1977 (1977-10-11)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 451 (E - 0984) 27 September 1990 (1990-09-27)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 235 (E - 766) 30 May 1989 (1989-05-30)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 00402030 A 20000717