Global Patent Index - EP 1175246 A4

EP 1175246 A4 2004-12-15 - UPREGULATION OF TYPE III ENDOTHELIAL CELL NITRIC OXIDE SYNTHASE BY HMG-CoA REDUCTASE INHIBITORS

Title (en)

UPREGULATION OF TYPE III ENDOTHELIAL CELL NITRIC OXIDE SYNTHASE BY HMG-CoA REDUCTASE INHIBITORS

Title (de)

STEIGERUNG DER TYPE III ENDOTHELIALZELL-STICKSTOFFOXID-SYNTHASE DURCH HMG-COA-REDUKTASE HEMMER

Title (fr)

REGULATION POSITIVE DE L'OXYDE NITRIQUE SYNTHASE DES CELLULES ENDOTHELIALES DE TYPE III PAR DES INHIBITEURS DE LA HMG-COA REDUCTASE

Publication

EP 1175246 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00916511 A

Priority

  • US 0007221 W
  • US 27344599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0056403A1] A new use for HMG-CoA reductase inhibitors is provided. In the instant invention, HMG-CoA reductase inhibitors are found to upregulate endothelial cell Nitric Oxide Synthase activity through a mechanism other than preventing the formation of oxidative-LDL. As a result, HMG-CoA reductase inhibitors are useful in treating or preventing conditions that result from the abnormally low expression and/or activity of endothelial cell Nitric Oxide Synthase. Such conditions include pulmonary hypertension, ischemic stroke, impotence, heart failure, hypoxia-induced conditions, insulin deficiency, progressive renal disease, gastric or esophageal motility syndrome, etc. Subjects thought to benefit mostly from such treatments include nonhyperlipidemics and nonhypercholesterolemics, but not necessarily exclude hyperlipidemics and hypercholesterolemics.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61P 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/198 (2006.01); A61K 31/365 (2006.01); A61K 31/366 (2006.01); A61K 31/505 (2006.01); A61K 31/519 (2006.01); A61K 31/7084 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61P 1/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/04 (2006.01); A61P 5/50 (2006.01); A61P 7/02 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 9/12 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 13/02 (2006.01); A61P 13/12 (2006.01); A61P 15/10 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C12Q 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/7048 (2013.01); A61K 31/00 (2013.01); A61K 31/365 (2013.01); A61K 31/366 (2013.01); A61K 31/505 (2013.01); A61K 45/06 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 45/06 + A61K 31/70 + A61K 31/365
  2. A61K 31/7048 + A61K 31/366
  3. A61K 31/505 + A61K 31/365
  4. A61K 31/365 + A61K 31/195
  5. A61K 31/365 + A61K 2300/00
  6. A61K 31/505 + A61K 2300/00
  7. A61K 31/7048 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0671171 A1 19950913 - SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]
  • [XP] WO 9918952 A1 19990422 - BRIGHAM & WOMENS HOSPITAL [US], et al
  • [X] LAUFS ET AL: "inhibition of HMG-CoA reductase blocks hypoxia-mediated down-regulation of endothelial nitric oxide synthase", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, vol. 272, no. 50, 12 December 1997 (1997-12-12), pages 31725 - 31729, XP002091893, ISSN: 0021-9258
  • [X] ENDRES ET AL: "stroke protection by HMG-CoA reductase inhibitors mediated by endothelial nitric oxide synthase", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, vol. 95, no. 15, 1 July 1998 (1998-07-01), pages 8880 - 8885, XP002091890, ISSN: 0027-8424
  • [A] BOEGER RAINER H ET AL: "Dietary L-arginine reduces the progression of atherosclerosis in cholesterol-fed rabbits: Comparison with lovastatin", CIRCULATION, vol. 96, no. 4, 1997, pages 1282 - 1290, XP002302014, ISSN: 0009-7322
  • See also references of WO 0056403A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0056403 A1 20000928; AU 3760300 A 20001009; CA 2368187 A1 20000928; EP 1175246 A1 20020130; EP 1175246 A4 20041215; JP 2003511347 A 20030325

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061011

2004-12-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041104

2004-07-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL, INC.

2004-07-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LIAO, JAMES, K.

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAUFS, ULRICH

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ENDRES, MATTHIAS

2002-05-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MOSKOWITZ, MICHAEL, A.

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011017

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI