Global Patent Index - EP 1175848 A3

EP 1175848 A3 2002-11-20 - Hydrobrush

Title (en)

Hydrobrush

Title (de)

Rotierende Bürste mit Flüssigkeitsantrieb

Title (fr)

Brosse rotative à moteur hydraulique

Publication

EP 1175848 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01118113 A

Priority

IT BO20000102 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1175848A2] The speed reducing gear (7-14) which connects kinematically the impeller (G) of the turbine with the axis of the rotating brush (SR) is housed in a box (S) the walls (19) of which are preferably obtained integral with the bottom of the body (1) of the same hydrobrush, which is sufficiently closed by suitable means and which is provided with suitable openings in order to ensure a good soundproofing of the operation of said gear, in order to protect the same against the action of the dirty removed by the rotary brush and to ensure, at the same time, a sufficient circulation of the water in said box for the lubrication of said speed reducing gear. The housing box (S) of the gear can be closed by the body closed in its upper portion of the impeller (G), or by a suitable lid (21) snap assembled, for example, onto said side walls (19), and provided with a hole (22) traversed with clearance by the hub of the impeller, with the toothed wheel (14) of input of the motion. The box (S) is provided in height with openings (20) placed, for example, in the corner zones of the side walls (19). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 13/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1175848 A2 20020130; EP 1175848 A3 20021120; IT 251139 Y1 20031104; IT BO20000102 U1 20020128; IT BO20000102 V0 20000727

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-09-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI