Global Patent Index - EP 1177207 A4

EP 1177207 A4 2003-06-04 - DNA ENCODING THE PROSTATE-SPECIFIC MEMBRANE ANTIGEN-LIKE GENE AND USES THEREOF

Title (en)

DNA ENCODING THE PROSTATE-SPECIFIC MEMBRANE ANTIGEN-LIKE GENE AND USES THEREOF

Title (de)

FÜR DAS PROSTATASPEZIFISCHE MEMBRAN-ANTIGENARTIGE GEN KODIERENDE DNA UND IHRE VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

ADN CODANT POUR LE GENE DE TYPE ANTIGENE MEMBRANAIRE SPECIFIQUE DE LA PROSTATE ET UTILISATIONS DE CELUI-CI

Publication

EP 1177207 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00921932 A

Priority

  • US 0009417 W
  • US 12883999 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0061605A1] The present invention discloses a new gene, termed PSMA-like, that is very similar to the prostate-specific membrane antigen (PSMA) gene and cross-reacts with current detection methods for PSMA. The present invention also provides for a method of distinguishing the PSMA and PSMA-like mRNAs and/or proteins for diagnostic and therapeutic strategies that desire specific targeting of either the PSMA or PSMA-like gene.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 1/00; C07K 14/00; C12N 1/12; C12N 1/20; C12N 5/00; C12N 5/02; C12N 15/00; C12N 15/09; C12N 15/63; C12N 15/70; C12N 15/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 2039/505 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9626272 A1 19960829 - SLOAN KETTERING INST CANCER [US], et al
  • [XDY] O'KEEFE D S ET AL: "MAPPING, GENOMIC ORGANIZATION AND PROMOTER ANALYSIS OF THE HUMAN PROSTATE-SPECIFIC MEMBRANE ANTIGEN GENE", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 1443, no. 1/2, November 1998 (1998-11-01), pages 113 - 127, XP001023046, ISSN: 0006-3002
  • [Y] O'KEEFE D S ET AL: "Identification and characterization of a new member of the prostate-specific membrane antigen gene family.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL, vol. 40, March 1999 (1999-03-01), 90th Annual Meeting of the American Association for Cancer Research;Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA; April 10-14, 1999, March, 1999, pages 482, XP001147724, ISSN: 0197-016X
  • See also references of WO 0061605A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0061605 A1 20001019; AU 4218900 A 20001114; AU 774697 B2 20040701; CA 2370033 A1 20001019; EP 1177207 A1 20020206; EP 1177207 A4 20030604

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060825

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031126

2003-06-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030425

2002-02-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011006

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI