Global Patent Index - EP 1177752 A3

EP 1177752 A3 2002-11-13 - Display device for photographs or the like

Title (en)

Display device for photographs or the like

Title (de)

Präsentationseinrichtung für Fotos o. dgl.

Title (fr)

Présentoir pour photos ou similaires

Publication

EP 1177752 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01114494 A

Priority

CH 15112000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1177752A2] The display for photographs, and the like, is a board (1) with a transparent adhesive holding layer (2). Film material components (10,10') fit the outer contour of the board, to be mounted at the edges to form a frame, held in place by the adhesive layer. Photographs (8) and the like can be arranged as required on the adhesive layer of the panel, to stay in place and be lifted clear easily for a change of presentation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 1/0627 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1177752 A2 20020206; EP 1177752 A3 20021113

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-09-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI