Global Patent Index - EP 1177973 A3

EP 1177973 A3 2002-09-04 - Water vessel arrangement

Title (en)

Water vessel arrangement

Title (de)

Vorrichtung in einem Wasserfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Arrangement pour bateau

Publication

EP 1177973 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01306698 A

Priority

  • GB 0019158 A
  • GB 0109379 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1177973A2] A modular water vessel arrangement which includes a support member (1), a first module which includes a debris collection means, and a second module which includes a work station. The support member (1) is arranged to support the first module which is interchangeable with the second module. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 35/32; B63B 35/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 35/32 (2006.01); B63B 35/44 (2006.01); B63B 1/12 (2006.01); B63B 59/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 35/32 (2013.01); B63B 35/44 (2013.01); B63B 1/121 (2013.01); B63B 59/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1177973 A2 20020206; EP 1177973 A3 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2009-03-20 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1045483

2004-06-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031010

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030227

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI