Global Patent Index - EP 1178301 A4

EP 1178301 A4 2003-06-11 - DEFECT MARKING METHOD AND DEVICE

Title (en)

DEFECT MARKING METHOD AND DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MARKIERUNG VON FEHLERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE MARQUAGE DE DEFAUTS

Publication

EP 1178301 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00909637 A

Priority

  • JP 0001559 W
  • JP 7296299 A
  • JP 17977699 A
  • JP 18796199 A
  • JP 28370399 A
  • JP 2000017739 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1178301A1] The defect marking method comprises the steps of: installing a surface defect tester to detect surface flaw and a marker device to apply marking at defect position, in a continuous processing line of steel sheet; detecting the surface flaw on the steel sheet using the surface defect tester; determining defect name, defect grade, defect length, and defect position in the width direction of the steel sheet, on the basis of thus detected flaw information, further identifying the defect in terms of harmful defect, injudgicable defect, and harmless defect; applying tracking of the defect position for each of the harmful defect and the injudgicable defect; and applying marking to the defect position. The defect marking device comprises a defect inspection means having plurality of light-receiving parts and a signal processing section, and a marking means. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 21/892; B21C 51/00; G01N 21/55; G01N 21/89

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 51/00 (2006.01); G01N 21/89 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 51/005 (2013.01); G01N 21/89 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] US 4817424 A 19890404 - PELLATIRO LEONARD P [US]
  • [AY] US 5680473 A 19971021 - KANZAKA TAKASHI [JP], et al
  • [A] US 2930228 A 19600329 - LAWRENCE EDWARD S, et al
  • [A] EP 0032975 A2 19810805 - KIESERLING & ALBRECHT [DE]
  • [YA] US 3653596 A 19720404 - ABRAMS PAUL S, et al
  • [A] DE 2558312 A1 19770707 - MOHN OHG REINHARD
  • [A] US 5732874 A 19980331 - KRENGEL THEODORE H [US], et al
  • [A] OBESO F ET AL: "INTELLIGENT ON-LINE SURFACE INSPECTION ON A SKINPASS MILL", IRON AND STEEL ENGINEER, ASSOCIATION OF IRON AND STEEL ENGINEERS. PITTSBURGH, US, vol. 74, no. 9, 1 September 1997 (1997-09-01), pages 29 - 35, XP000703522, ISSN: 0021-1559
  • [A] BACKELANDT B ET AL: "SYSTEME D'INSPECTION AUTOMATIQUE DE SURFACE SIAS. SIAS: AUTOMATIC STRIP SURFACE INSPECTION SYSTEM", CAHIERS D'INFORMATIONS TECHNIQUES DE LA REVUE DE METALLURGIE, REVUE DE METALLURGIE. PARIS, FR, vol. 93, no. 10, 1 October 1996 (1996-10-01), pages 1265 - 1269, XP000639099, ISSN: 0035-1563
  • [A] SIMONIS M ET AL: "SURFACE INSPECTION FOR AUTOMATIC DETECTION AND CLASSIFICATION OF DEFECTS ON HOT STRIP", STEEL TIMES INTERNATIONAL.(INC. STEEL TIMES), DMG WORLD MEDIA, REDHILL, SURREY, GB, vol. 22, no. 5, 1 September 1998 (1998-09-01), pages 24,28, XP000790084, ISSN: 0143-7798
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 10 31 October 1997 (1997-10-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 10 31 October 1997 (1997-10-31)
  • See also references of WO 0055605A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

DOCDB simple family

EP 1178301 A1 20020206; EP 1178301 A4 20030611; EP 1178301 B1 20071031; CA 2365879 A1 20000921; CA 2365879 C 20091124; CA 2676748 A1 20000921; CA 2676748 C 20111025; DE 60036939 D1 20071213; DE 60036939 T2 20080807; EP 1857811 A2 20071121; EP 1857811 A3 20080625; KR 100458048 B1 20041118; KR 100568973 B1 20060407; KR 20040028944 A 20040403; US 2002154308 A1 20021024; US 2007052964 A1 20070308; US 2009086209 A1 20090402; US 7248366 B2 20070724; US 7423744 B2 20080909; US 7599052 B2 20091006; WO 0055605 A1 20000921