EP 1178788 A4 20050810 - NOVEL DIPHENYLETHYLENE COMPOUNDS
Title (en)
NOVEL DIPHENYLETHYLENE COMPOUNDS
Title (de)
NEUE DIPHENYLETHYLENVERBINDUNGEN
Title (fr)
COMPOSES DIPHENYLETHYLENE INNOVANTS
Publication
Application
Priority
US 9911001 W 19990518
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO0069430A1] Novel diphenylethylene and styrenes are provided which are administered orally to decrease blood glucose levels in rats. The glucose tolerance in insulin resistant rats is also shown, as well as lowering of triglyceride levels in serum insulin resistant, hyperinsulinemic and hypertriglycedemic rats. The compounds are orally effective anti-diabetic agents that potentially may reduce abnormality of glucose and lipid metabolism in diabetes.
IPC 1-7
A61K 31/192; A61K 31/09; A61K 31/05; A61P 3/10; C07C 59/48; C07C 43/205; C07C 43/215; C07C 39/06; C07C 39/215
IPC 8 full level
A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61K 31/05 (2006.01); A61K 31/085 (2006.01); A61K 31/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/192 (2006.01); C07C 39/15 (2006.01); C07C 39/19 (2006.01); C07C 39/205 (2006.01); C07C 43/215 (2006.01); C07C 43/23 (2006.01); C07C 59/68 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR)
A61K 31/05 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 31/09 (2013.01 - EP); A61K 31/192 (2013.01 - EP); A61P 3/00 (2017.12 - EP); A61P 3/10 (2017.12 - EP); A61P 5/00 (2017.12 - EP); C07C 15/50 (2013.01 - KR); C07C 39/15 (2013.01 - EP); C07C 43/215 (2013.01 - EP); C07C 59/68 (2013.01 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [E] WO 9956737 A1 19991111 - INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR], et al
- [X] RYU S Y ET AL: "Antitumor activity of some phenolic components in plants", ARCHIVES OF PHARMACAL RESEARCH, NATL. FISHERIES UNIVERSITY, PUSAN, KR, vol. 17, no. 1, January 1994 (1994-01-01), pages 42 - 44, XP002968965, ISSN: 0253-6269
- [X] JANG DAE-SIG ET AL: "Inhibitory effects of resveratrol analogs on unopsonized zymosan-induced oxygen radical production", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, vol. 57, no. 6, 15 March 1999 (1999-03-15), pages 705 - 712, XP002322563, ISSN: 0006-2952
- [X] MANICKAM M ET AL: "ANTIHYPERGLYCEMIC ACTIVITY OF PHENOLICS FROM PTEROCARPUS MARSUPIUM", JOURNAL OF NATURAL PRODUCTS, XX, XX, vol. 6, no. 60, 23 June 1997 (1997-06-23), pages 609 - 610, XP001066243, ISSN: 0163-3864
- See references of WO 0069430A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 0069430 A1 20001123; AU 4085799 A 20001205; AU 778767 B2 20041223; AU 778767 C 20060907; CA 2373603 A1 20001123; CN 1194674 C 20050330; CN 1354659 A 20020619; EP 1178788 A1 20020213; EP 1178788 A4 20050810; HK 1046642 A1 20030124; HK 1046642 B 20051125; JP 2002544227 A 20021224; KR 100598638 B1 20060707; KR 20020012220 A 20020215; MX PA01011760 A 20030904
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 9911001 W 19990518; AU 4085799 A 19990518; CA 2373603 A 19990518; CN 99816644 A 19990518; EP 99924332 A 19990518; HK 02108244 A 20021114; JP 2000617889 A 19990518; KR 20017014590 A 20011116; MX PA01011760 A 19990518