Global Patent Index - EP 1179267 A4

EP 1179267 A4 2002-11-06 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMUNICATING BETWEEN A SPECIAL NUMBER CALL ANSWERING AGENCY AND A MOBILE ACTION ASSET

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMUNICATING BETWEEN A SPECIAL NUMBER CALL ANSWERING AGENCY AND A MOBILE ACTION ASSET

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KOMMUNIKATION ZWISCHEN EINER AGENTUR ZUR SPEZIELLER NUMMERN ANRUFBEANTWORTUNG UND EINER MOBILEN AKTIONSEINHEIT

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE COMMUNICATION ENTRE UN ORGANISME REPONDANT A UN NUMERO D'APPEL SPECIAL ET UN ELEMENT D'ACTION MOBILE

Publication

EP 1179267 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 01905460 A

Priority

  • US 0103819 W
  • US 49977300 A
  • US 51899700 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0160086A1] A system (250) for communicating between a special number call answering agency (256) and a mobile action asset (260) is disclosed. The call answering agency (256) answers a special number call placed by a caller (252). The mobile asset (260) participates in responding to the call. The answering agency (256) and the mobile asset (260) are configured to communicate wirelessly. The answering agency (256) is configured to recognize and interpret special number information, including at least one of identification information and location information relating to the caller (252). The system (250) includes: (a) a special number receiving terminal (262) located with the mobile asset (260); the receiving terminal (262) is configured to receive and display selected information of the special number information; the receiving terminal (262) being configured to dial back the caller (252) based upon the selected information and (b) a call bridge (216); the call bridge (216) is configured for actuation at the call answering agency (256). The call bridge (216) connects the caller (252) with the mobile asset (260) and provides the selected information to the mobile asset (260) when the call bridge (216) is in an actuated orientation. The method comprises the steps of: (a) in no particular order: (1) locating a special number receiving terminal with the mobile asset; the receiving terminal being configured to receive selected information of the special number information; and (2) providing a special number call bridge; the call bridge being configured for actuation at the answering agency; (b) orienting the call bridge in an actuated orientation to connect the caller with the mobile asset; and (c) providing said selected information to the mobile asset.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/20; G01S 1/08; G01S 3/02; G08G 1/0968; G08G 1/123; H04M 1/57; H04M 3/42; H04M 3/523; H04M 11/04; H04Q 7/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01S 1/08 (2006.01); G01S 3/02 (2006.01); G08G 1/0968 (2006.01); G08G 1/123 (2006.01); H04L 12/66 (2006.01); H04M 1/57 (2006.01); H04M 3/42 (2006.01); H04M 3/523 (2006.01); H04M 11/04 (2006.01); H04Q 7/20 (2006.01); H04Q 7/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/66 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0160086 A1 20010816; CA 2383380 A1 20010816; CA 2383380 C 20100420; EP 1179267 A1 20020213; EP 1179267 A4 20021106

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20161028

2014-11-19 [D11X] LEGAL MEANS OF EXECUTION (DELETED)

2013-10-02 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

- Effective date: 20130410

2013-03-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCATEL-LUCENT USA INC.

2009-09-02 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030124

2002-11-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04Q 7/20 A, 7G 08G 1/123 B, 7H 04M 3/42 B, 7H 04M 1/57 B, 7H 04Q 7/38 B, 7G 01S 1/08 B, 7G 01S 3/02 B, 7H 04M 11/04 B, 7H 04M 3/523 B, 7G 08G 1/0968 B

2002-02-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011205

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR