Global Patent Index - EP 1180164 A4

EP 1180164 A4 2002-11-27 - METHODS USING OF FAB I AND COMPOUNDS MODULATING FAB I ACTIVITY

Title (en)

METHODS USING OF FAB I AND COMPOUNDS MODULATING FAB I ACTIVITY

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON FABI UND VERBINDUNG, WELCHE DIE FABI-AKTIVITäT VERäNDERT

Title (fr)

PROCEDES UTILISANT DES COMPOSES DE FAB I ET DES COMPOSES MODULANT L'ACTIVITE DE FAB I

Publication

EP 1180164 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00935862 A

Priority

  • US 0012104 W
  • US 13436299 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0070017A2] Prokayrotic FAB I polypeptides and DNA (RNA) encoding such FAB I and a procedure for producing such polypeptides by recombinant techniques is disclosed. Also disclosed are methods for utilizing such FAB I for the treatment of infection, such as bacterial infections. Antagonists against such FAB I and their use as a therapeutic to treat /infections, such as staphylococcal infections are also disclosed. Also disclosed are diagnostic assays for detecting diseases related to the presence of FAB I nucleic acid sequences and the polypeptides in a host. Also disclosed are diagnostic assays for detecting polynucleotides encoding FAB I and for detecting the polypeptide in a host.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/26; A01N 25/00; A61K 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/10 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C12N 9/02 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/001 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 0070017A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0070017 A2 20001123; WO 0070017 A3 20010208; EP 1180164 A2 20020220; EP 1180164 A4 20021127; JP 2002544291 A 20021224

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051027

2004-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AFFINIUM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

2003-06-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AFFINIUM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

2003-06-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC

2003-05-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHODS OF USING FAB I AND COMPOUNDS MODULATING FAB I ACTIVITY

2002-11-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021015

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC

2002-02-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011214

2002-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE