Global Patent Index - EP 1180288 A4

EP 1180288 A4 2003-06-11 - ENTERPRISE CONTACT SERVER WITH ENHANCED ROUTING FEATURES

Title (en)

ENTERPRISE CONTACT SERVER WITH ENHANCED ROUTING FEATURES

Title (de)

SERVER ZUR VERBINDUNGSAUFNAHME MIT UNTERNEHMEN MIT VERBESSERTEN ROUTING-MERKMALEN

Title (fr)

SERVEUR DE CONTACT D'ENTREPRISE AVEC CARACTERISTIQUES D'ACHEMINEMENT AMELIOREES

Publication

EP 1180288 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00932697 A

Priority

  • US 0014058 W
  • US 31756199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0072535A1] The present invention is an Enterprise Contact Server (100) that enables customers to submit call-back requests to agents (13) located at any one of a plurality of call centers (116) via the Internet (32), or virtually any other communications technology available.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 12/64; H04M 3/51; H04M 3/523

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01); H04M 3/42 (2006.01); H04M 3/51 (2006.01); H04M 3/523 (2006.01); H04M 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 65/4007 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2013.01); H04L 67/14 (2013.01); H04M 3/5191 (2013.01); H04M 3/5237 (2013.01); H04M 7/0027 (2013.01); H04L 29/06027 (2013.01); H04L 67/42 (2013.01); H04L 69/329 (2013.01); H04M 3/5231 (2013.01); H04M 3/5233 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 5884032 A 19990316 - BATEMAN THOMAS HOWARD [CA], et al
  • [YX] WO 9854877 A2 19981203 - GENESYS TELECOMM LAB INC [US]
  • [A] EP 0856980 A2 19980805 - ROLM SYSTEMS [US]
  • [A] US 5825869 A 19981020 - BROOKS NANCY SINLING [CA], et al
  • [A] WEBLINE: "Press Release 8-9-1997", WEBLINE PRESS RELEASE, 8 September 1997 (1997-09-08), pages 1 - 4, XP002231318, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:www.webline.com/news/press/1997/9-8-97.htm> [retrieved on 20030214]
  • See also references of WO 0072535A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0072535 A1 20001130; AU 5038500 A 20001212; AU 771695 B2 20040401; BR 0010933 A 20020423; CA 2374329 A1 20001130; EP 1180288 A1 20020220; EP 1180288 A4 20030611; JP 2003500929 A 20030107; MX PA01012024 A 20020621

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050204

2003-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030909

2003-06-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 12/64 A

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04M 3/523 B

2003-04-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04M 3/51 B

2002-02-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011123

2002-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI