Global Patent Index - EP 1180340 B1

EP 1180340 B1 2003-06-25 - Suction nozzle for vacuum cleaner

Title (en)

Suction nozzle for vacuum cleaner

Title (de)

Saugkopf für Bodenstaubsauger

Title (fr)

Suceur pour aspirateur

Publication

EP 1180340 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01127814 A

Priority

  • DE 29900713 U
  • EP 99124204 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1020159A2] The suction head (1) has the usual sole plate (2) and suction aperture (4) as well as a vertically moveable plate (5) behind, set by a lever (6), on which a plate (7) is covered by a fabric polishing material (8) for smooth floor surfaces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/06 (2013.01); A47L 9/0613 (2013.01); A47L 9/0653 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29900713 U1 19990624; EP 1020159 A2 20000719; EP 1020159 A3 20001115; EP 1020159 B1 20020605; EP 1180340 A2 20020220; EP 1180340 A3 20020619; EP 1180340 B1 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091203

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091203

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091203

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081227

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081204

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031025

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906132 P 20030731

2003-06-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1020159 P

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-02-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011122

2002-02-20 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1020159

2002-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT