Global Patent Index - EP 1180462 A3

EP 1180462 A3 2002-09-18 - Single-axle wheel set with outer suspension supports for railway vehicles with pendulum-type suspension

Title (en)

Single-axle wheel set with outer suspension supports for railway vehicles with pendulum-type suspension

Title (de)

Einachsiger Radsatz mit Aussenaufhängungsstützen für Eisenbahnfahrzeuge mit Pendelaufhängung

Title (fr)

Jeu de roues d'un seul axe avec supports de suspension extérieurs pour véhicules de chemins de fer avec suspension de type pendulaire

Publication

EP 1180462 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01500211 A

Priority

ES 200002080 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1180462A2] A single-axle wheel set (10) with outer suspension supports for railway vehicles with pendulum-type suspension. This wheel set (10) consists of a flat, horizontal chassis on which the independent, movable wheels are mounted, and upright suspension supports situated at the outer part of the wheels and joined to each other at their upper part by means of a crosspiece (22) to form a portico, in whose upper part suspension springs are provided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 3/12; B61D 17/20; B61F 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/00 (2006.01); B61D 17/20 (2006.01); B61F 3/12 (2006.01); B61F 5/14 (2006.01); B61F 5/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 3/12 (2013.01); B61D 17/20 (2013.01); B61F 5/148 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1180462 A2 20020220; EP 1180462 A3 20020918; AR 030081 A1 20030813; AU 5801401 A 20020221; CA 2354970 A1 20020214; CN 1338407 A 20020306; EE 200100424 A 20020415; HU 0103297 A2 20021028; HU 0103297 A3 20031229; HU 0103297 D0 20011028; JP 2002067943 A 20020308; PL 349146 A1 20020225; SK 11252001 A3 20020305; US 2002017216 A1 20020214

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040301

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021126

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-02-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI