Global Patent Index - EP 1180573 A3

EP 1180573 A3 2002-11-20 - Casing frame for a thermally insulating door or window

Title (en)

Casing frame for a thermally insulating door or window

Title (de)

Zarge für ein Fenster oder eine Tür in wärmegedämmter Ausführung

Title (fr)

Dormant pour une porte ou fenêtre thermo-isolante

Publication

EP 1180573 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01118201 A

Priority

DE 10040497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10040497C1] The door or window aperture frame (1) has upper and lower transverse elements (3) and perpendicular side elements made of a rigid plastics foam (4) provided with internal reinforcing profiles (5). The transverse elements are provided with inwards projecting stops (22), fitting over the visible part of the door or window panel frame and are covered on the outside with thin-walled aluminum or plastics profiles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 1/02; E06B 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/02 (2006.01); E06B 1/32 (2006.01); E06B 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/308 (2013.01); E06B 1/02 (2013.01); E06B 1/325 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10040497 C1 20011011; EP 1180573 A2 20020220; EP 1180573 A3 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-09-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-02-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI