Global Patent Index - EP 1180582 A3

EP 1180582 A3 2002-11-06 - Variable phasing device between a camshaft and a driving wheel in an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Variable phasing device between a camshaft and a driving wheel in an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur relativen Drehwinkelverstellung einer Nockenwelle einer Brennkraftmaschine zu einem Antriebsrad

Title (fr)

Dispositif variateur de phase entre un arbre à cames et une roue d'entraInement, pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1180582 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01112996 A

Priority

DE 10039913 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10039913C1] The device has an inner part (4) fixed to a cam shaft (2), which has radial blades, and a driven cellular wheel (12), which is separated into several cells by bars, which are divided by the blades of the inner part into two pressure spaces (26b). Hydraulic action through control lines rotates the cam shaft between two end positions with respect to the cellular wheel. At least one locking unit between the inner part and the cellular wheel locks the inner part in at least one end position opposite the cellular wheel. At least one blade of the inner part has a head part (58) with at least one locking element, which co-operates with a locking structure on at least one bar of the cellular wheel. The head part slides radially and can be guided into locked or unlocked positions according to the operation parameters.

[origin: DE10039913C1] The device has an inner part (4) fixed to a cam shaft (2), which has radial blades, and a driven cellular wheel (12), which is separated into several cells by bars, which are divided by the blades of the inner part into two pressure spaces (26b). Hydraulic action through control lines rotates the cam shaft between two end positions with respect to the cellular wheel. At least one locking unit between the inner part and the cellular wheel locks the inner part in at least one end position opposite the cellular wheel. At least one blade of the inner part has a head part (58) with at least one locking element, which co-operates with a locking structure on at least one bar of the cellular wheel. The head part slides radially and can be guided into locked or unlocked positions according to the operation parameters.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/344

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/34 (2006.01); F01L 1/344 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/3442 (2013.01); F01L 2001/34453 (2013.01); F01L 2001/34456 (2013.01); F01L 2001/34473 (2013.01); Y10T 74/2102 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 6053139 A 20000425 - EGUCHI KATSUHIKO [JP], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 03 30 March 2000 (2000-03-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 11 3 January 2001 (2001-01-03)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 02 29 February 2000 (2000-02-29)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10039913 C1 20011018; EP 1180582 A2 20020220; EP 1180582 A3 20021106; EP 1180582 B1 20040128; ES 2211695 T3 20040716; JP 2002106310 A 20020410; US 2002026916 A1 20020307; US 6584944 B2 20030701

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50101382

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140619

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HILITE GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HYDRAULIK-RING GMBH, 97828 MARKTHEIDENFELD, DE

- Document: DE 50101382

- Effective date: 20130521

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090611

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090612

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090612

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090611

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090611

2009-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-10-09 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080613

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080623

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-11-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2211695 T3

2004-03-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50101382 P 20040304

2004-02-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DR.ING. H.C.F. PORSCHEAKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2003-09-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HYDRAULIK-RING GMBH

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-02-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI