Global Patent Index - EP 1180592 A3

EP 1180592 A3 2002-09-11 - Steel piston

Title (en)

Steel piston

Title (de)

Stahlkolben

Title (fr)

Piston en acier

Publication

EP 1180592 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01117240 A

Priority

DE 10040486 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1180592A2] The piston comprises a base section (1) which with an annular section (3) forms a cooling passage to which is supplied cooling medium via a hole. After the final machining of the piston at least one additional opening exists between the base section and annular section and is especially an encircling gap (6). The gap is created through the attachment and shape of the annular section with regard to the base section. The annular section is joined to the base section by a welding method. A protrusion (5) is formed on at least the annular section and orientated in the direction of the base section, forming with the wall of the base section the additional gap.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 3/00; F02F 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 3/003 (2013.01); F05C 2201/0448 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1180592 A2 20020220; EP 1180592 A3 20020911; EP 1180592 B1 20060315; DE 10040486 A1 20020307; DE 10040486 C2 20021031; DE 50109197 D1 20060511

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50109197

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100717

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100717

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090716

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061218

2006-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060615

2006-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50109197 P 20060511

2006-04-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060315

2006-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2006-03-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-03-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060315

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02F 3/00 A, 7F 02F 3/22 B

2002-02-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010717

2002-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-02-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI