Global Patent Index - EP 1180866 A4

EP 1180866 A4 2002-12-18 - BASE STATION APPARATUS AND RADIO COMMUNICATION METHOD

Title (en)

BASE STATION APPARATUS AND RADIO COMMUNICATION METHOD

Title (de)

BASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE STATION DE BASE ET PROCEDE DE RADIOCOMMUNICATION

Publication

EP 1180866 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 01915703 A

Priority

  • JP 0102286 W
  • JP 2000085915 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1180866A1] Spectrum efficiency is improved by assigning only a small number of subcarriers to a paging channel as compared with a traffic channel to which a large number of subcarriers are assigned. Also, by grouping users and assigning the paging channel of each group to a corresponding subcarrier, the received band is reduced and processing involved in reception decreased, and power consumption is reduced, thus saving battery power. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04J 11/00 (2006.01); H04B 7/26 (2006.01); H04J 13/00 (2011.01); H04L 5/06 (2006.01); H04W 16/02 (2009.01); H04W 48/12 (2009.01); H04W 52/02 (2009.01); H04W 68/02 (2009.01); H04W 88/08 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 68/02 (2013.01); H04L 5/06 (2013.01); H04W 48/12 (2013.01); H04W 88/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1180866 A1 20020220; EP 1180866 A4 20021218; AU 4275101 A 20011008; BR 0105384 A 20020226; CA 2374036 A1 20011004; CN 1366748 A 20020828; JP 2001274767 A 20011005; JP 3485860 B2 20040113; US 2002159426 A1 20021031; WO 0173990 A1 20011004

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030607

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-12-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 04B 7/26 A

2002-02-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011210

2002-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-02-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI