Global Patent Index - EP 1181084 B1

EP 1181084 B1 2009-02-25 - A DEVICE FOR TREATING A GAS

Title (en)

A DEVICE FOR TREATING A GAS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINES GASES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE TRAITER UN GAZ

Publication

EP 1181084 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 00935780 A

Priority

  • SE 0001001 W
  • SE 9901842 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0071223A1] A device for treating a substantially gaseous medium includes a number of parallel plates (14) which are connected to each other and provided adjacent to each other in such a manner that they by means of port holes of the plates (14) form a first channel (5) and a second channel (9, 9'). The first channel (5) is arranged to transport the gaseous medium, and the second channel (9, 9'), which is separated from but in heat transferring contact with the first channel (5), is arranged to transport a cooling medium for cooling the gaseous medium. At least a part (3) of the first channel (5) is arranged to separate liquid from the gaseous medium. Said part (3) of the first channel (5) is formed by a plurality of plate interspaces between a part of said plates (14), wherein at least one of the plates (14), delimiting one of said plate interspaces, is arranged to be passed by the gaseous medium on both sides thereof.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 5/00 (2006.01); F28D 1/03 (2006.01); B01D 53/22 (2006.01); B01D 53/26 (2006.01); F04B 39/16 (2006.01); F28D 1/06 (2006.01); F28D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/22 (2013.01); B01D 5/0015 (2013.01); B01D 5/0039 (2013.01); B01D 63/08 (2013.01); F04B 39/16 (2013.01); F28D 9/0043 (2013.01); F28D 9/0093 (2013.01); F28F 17/005 (2013.01); B01D 2313/22 (2013.01); B01D 2313/38 (2013.01); B01D 2319/04 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0064 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0071223 A1 20001130; AT 423603 T 20090315; AU 5118900 A 20001212; CN 1195568 C 20050406; CN 1356919 A 20020703; DE 60041640 D1 20090409; EP 1181084 A1 20020227; EP 1181084 B1 20090225; EP 1181084 B8 20090805; ES 2320406 T3 20090522; JP 2003500183 A 20030107; JP 4564177 B2 20101020; SE 514092 C2 20010108; SE 9901842 D0 19990520; SE 9901842 L 20001121; US 6536511 B1 20030325

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180314

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180329

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170602

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170508

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170413

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170509

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170512

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090225

2011-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090526

2010-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090518

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2009-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2009-06-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2009-05-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU

2009-05-22 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2320406 T3

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60041640 P 20090409

2009-04-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU

2009-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B01D 5/00 20060101AFI20080926BHEP

2008-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04B 39/16 20060101ALI20080926BHEP

2008-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B01D 53/22 20060101ALI20080926BHEP

2006-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060919

2002-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011009

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU

2002-02-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI