Global Patent Index - EP 1181132 B1

EP 1181132 B1 2003-06-11 - ROUGH-GRINDING AND FINISH-GRINDING A CRANKSHAFT IN A CLAMPING

Title (en)

ROUGH-GRINDING AND FINISH-GRINDING A CRANKSHAFT IN A CLAMPING

Title (de)

VOR- UND FERTIGSCHLEIFEN EINER KURBELWELLE IN EINER AUFSPANNUNG

Title (fr)

DEGROSSISSAGE ET FINISSAGE A LA MEULE D'UN VILEBREQUIN A L'AIDE D'UN SEUL DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION

Publication

EP 1181132 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00927018 A

Priority

  • DE 19919893 A
  • EP 0003633 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19919893A1] The present invention relates to a method for grinding a centrally clamped crankshaft (1). The invention also relates to a grinding machine (43) for crankshafts for carrying out said method and a crankshaft (1) consisting of high-alloy steel or cast. According to the inventive method, lifting bearings (12) and main bearings (11) of the crankshaft (1) are ground in a clamping in such a way that at least the main bearings (11) are rough-ground and subsequently the lifting bearings (12) and then the main bearings (11) are finish-ground. The grinding machine (43) for crankshafts forms a working centre by means of which corresponding rough-grinding and finish-grinding are possible in one single clamping.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 1/00; B24B 5/42; B24B 27/00; B24B 51/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 41/06 (2006.01); B24B 1/00 (2006.01); B24B 5/42 (2006.01); B24B 27/00 (2006.01); B24B 51/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 5/42 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19919893 A1 20001109; AU 4554600 A 20001117; CN 1157276 C 20040714; CN 1360534 A 20020724; CZ 20013878 A3 20020814; CZ 302536 B6 20110707; DE 50002544 D1 20030717; EP 1181132 A1 20020227; EP 1181132 B1 20030611; ES 2198307 T3 20040201; JP 2002542955 A 20021217; RU 2240218 C2 20041120; US 6878043 B1 20050412; WO 0066323 A1 20001109

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170630

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170503

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-08-16 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20060215

2006-03-15 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SCHLEIFRING SERVICE GMBH

- Effective date: 20040220

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCHAUDT MIKROSA BWF GMBH

- Effective date: 20040220

2004-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2198307 T3

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-11-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-10-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002544 P 20030717

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020328

2002-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011122

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI