EP 1181303 A4 20030409 - 50 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS
Title (en)
50 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS
Title (de)
50 HUMAN-AUSGESCHIEDENE PROTEINE
Title (fr)
50 PROTEINES HUMAINES SECRETEES
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 0008983 W 20000406
- US 12870399 P 19990409
- US 17606800 P 20000114
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO0061596A1] The present invention relates to novel human secreted proteins and isolated nucleic acids containing the coding regions of the genes encoding such proteins. Also provided are vectors, host cells, antibodies, and recombinant methods for producing human secreted proteins. The invention further relates to diagnostic and therapeutic methods useful for diagnosing and treating diseases, disorders, and/or conditions related to these novel human secreted proteins.
IPC 1-7
C07H 21/02; C07H 21/04; C12N 1/20; C12N 15/00; C12N 15/09; C12N 15/63; C12N 15/70; C12N 15/74
IPC 8 full level
G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 31/713 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/16 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/06 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 17/06 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 25/02 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/18 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
A61P 1/16 (2017.12); A61P 9/00 (2017.12); A61P 9/06 (2017.12); A61P 9/10 (2017.12); A61P 11/06 (2017.12); A61P 17/06 (2017.12); A61P 19/02 (2017.12); A61P 25/02 (2017.12); A61P 25/28 (2017.12); A61P 27/02 (2017.12); A61P 29/00 (2017.12); A61P 31/04 (2017.12); A61P 31/18 (2017.12); A61P 35/00 (2017.12); A61P 35/02 (2017.12); A61P 37/00 (2017.12); C07K 14/47 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [X] WO 9854963 A2 19981210 - HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al
- [X] DATABASE EMBL [online] 13 August 1998 (1998-08-13), XP002212773, Database accession no. AB007958
- [X] DATABASE EMBL [online] 16 March 1999 (1999-03-16), XP002212774, Database accession no. AI438933
- [X] DATABASE EMBL [online] 28 May 1995 (1995-05-28), XP002212775, Database accession no. R54685
- [X] DATABASE EMBL [online] 18 January 1999 (1999-01-18), XP002212776, Database accession no. AC006405
- [X] DATABASE EMBL [online] 23 October 1998 (1998-10-23), XP002212777, Database accession no. AC005841
- [PX] DATABASE EMBL [online] 10 September 1999 (1999-09-10), XP002212778, Database accession no. AL117348
- See references of WO 0061596A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 0061596 A1 20001019; WO 0061596 A8 20020620; AU 4072300 A 20001114; CA 2371172 A1 20001019; EP 1181303 A1 20020227; EP 1181303 A4 20030409; JP 2003523726 A 20030812
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 0008983 W 20000406; AU 4072300 A 20000406; CA 2371172 A 20000406; EP 00920141 A 20000406; JP 2000610865 A 20000406