Global Patent Index - EP 1181305 A4

EP 1181305 A4 2002-09-18 - METHODS OF MODULATING ACTIVITY OF PROKARYOTIC RIBOSOMES

Title (en)

METHODS OF MODULATING ACTIVITY OF PROKARYOTIC RIBOSOMES

Title (de)

METHODEN ZUR MODULIERUNG DER AKTIVITÄT PROKARYOTISCHER RIBOSOMEN

Title (fr)

TECHNIQUES DE MODULATION DE L'ACTIVIT DE RIBOSOMES PROCARYOTES

Publication

EP 1181305 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00946758 A

Priority

  • US 0012133 W
  • US 13497399 P
  • US 13783799 P
  • US 13909599 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0071560A1] This invention relates to newly identified polynucleotides and interactions of these polynucleotides with polypeptides, and their production and uses, as well as their variants, agonists and antagonists, and their uses. In particular, in these and in other regards, the invention relates to polynucleotides used in identifying compounds that modulate the activity of prokaryotic ribosomes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 21/02; A01N 61/00; C07H 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 31/164 (2006.01); A61K 31/22 (2006.01); A61K 31/7076 (2006.01); A61K 31/7088 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/12 (2006.01); A61P 1/18 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 13/02 (2006.01); A61P 13/12 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 27/16 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/63 (2006.01); C12N 15/67 (2006.01); C12P 19/34 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); C12R 1/19 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07H 21/04 (2013.01); C07H 21/02 (2013.01); C12N 15/11 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] DATABASE EMBL [online] EBI; 13 July 1983 (1983-07-13), "E.coli ribosomal operon rrnB encoding the 16S ribosomal RNA.", XP002206440, retrieved from EMBL Database accession no. V00348
  • [A] PORSE BO T ET AL: "Sites of interaction of streptogramin A and B antibiotics in the peptidyl transferase loop of 23 S rRNA and the synergism of their inhibitory mechanisms.", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, vol. 286, no. 2, 19 February 1999 (1999-02-19), pages 375 - 387, XP002206437, ISSN: 0022-2836
  • [A] MACBETH MARK R ET AL: "The phenotype of mutations of G2655 in the sarcin/ricin domain of 23 S ribosomal RNA.", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, vol. 285, no. 3, 22 January 1999 (1999-01-22), pages 965 - 975, XP002206438, ISSN: 0022-2836
  • [T] POULSEN SUSAN M ET AL: "The pleuromutilin drugs tiamulin and valnemulin bind to the RNA at the peptidyl transferase centre on the ribosome.", MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, vol. 41, no. 5, September 2001 (2001-09-01), pages 1091 - 1099, XP002206439, ISSN: 0950-382X
  • See also references of WO 0071560A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0071560 A1 20001130; EP 1181305 A1 20020227; EP 1181305 A4 20020918; JP 2003523729 A 20030812

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051101

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031125

2002-09-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020802

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC

2002-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011220

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI