Global Patent Index - EP 1181306 A4

EP 1181306 A4 2003-06-18 - COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR REGULATING APOPTOSIS, AND METHODS OF MAKING AND SCREENING FOR COMPOUNDS THAT REGULATE APOPTOSIS

Title (en)

COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR REGULATING APOPTOSIS, AND METHODS OF MAKING AND SCREENING FOR COMPOUNDS THAT REGULATE APOPTOSIS

Title (de)

VERBINDUNGEN UND METHODEN ZUR REGULIERUNG VON APOPTOSE UND METHODEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND ZUM SCREENING VON ENTSPRECHENDEN VERBINDUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSES ET METHODES DE REGULATION DE L'APOPTOSE, ET METHODES D'ELABORATION ET DE CRIBLAGE DE COMPOSES REGULATEURS DE L'APOPTOSE

Publication

EP 1181306 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00935853 A

Priority

  • US 0011864 W
  • US 13678399 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0110888A1] Novel forms of mutant BAD polypeptides or fragments thereof having amino acid substitutions for serine-155 are provided along with their encoding polynucleotides. Also disclosed are methods for preparation of the mutant BAD polypeptides, methods for screening candidate compounds and drugs for activity that promotes cell survival or apoptosis, methods for screening candidate compounds and drugs for phosphatase activity capable of dephosphorylating BAD, methods for screening candidate compounds and drugs for kinase activity capable of phosphorylating BAD, methods for screening candidate compounds and drugs for activity that promotes phosphorylation of BAD, anti-BAD antibodies, and methods for inhibiting and inducing apoptosis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 1/00; C07K 1/13; C07K 1/14; C07K 14/00; C07K 14/47; C12P 21/00; C12P 21/02; G01N 33/50; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/42 (2006.01); C12Q 1/48 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/4703 (2013.01); C07K 14/4702 (2013.01); C07K 14/4747 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] OTTILIE S ET AL: "Dimerization properties of human BAD. Identification of a BH-3 domain and analysis of its binding to mutant BCL-2 and BCL-XL proteins.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY. UNITED STATES 5 DEC 1997, vol. 272, no. 49, 5 December 1997 (1997-12-05), pages 30866 - 30872, XP002238393, ISSN: 0021-9258
  • [X] HARADA HISASHI ET AL: "Phosphorylation and inactivation of BAD by mitochondria-anchored protein kinase A.", MOLECULAR CELL, vol. 3, no. 4, April 1999 (1999-04-01), pages 413 - 422, XP002238394, ISSN: 1097-2765
  • [X] DATTA SANDEEP ROBERT ET AL: "Akt phosphorylation of BAD couples survival signals to the cell-intrinsic death machinery.", CELL, vol. 91, no. 2, 1997, pages 231 - 241, XP002238395, ISSN: 0092-8674
  • [X] ZHA JIPING ET AL: "Serine phosphorylation of death agonist BAD in response to survival factor results in binding to 14-3-3 not BCL-X-L.", CELL, vol. 87, no. 4, 1996, pages 619 - 628, XP002238396, ISSN: 0092-8674
  • [T] DATTA SANDEEP ROBERT ET AL: "14-3-3 proteins and survival kinases cooperate to inactivate BAD by BH3 domain phosphorylation.", MOLECULAR CELL, vol. 6, no. 1, July 2000 (2000-07-01), pages 41 - 51, XP002238397, ISSN: 1097-2765
  • [T] ZHOU XIAO-MAI ET AL: "Growth factors inactivate the cell death promoter BAD by phosphorylation of its BH3 domain on Ser155.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 275, no. 32, 11 August 2000 (2000-08-11), pages 25046 - 25051, XP002238398, ISSN: 0021-9258
  • See also references of WO 0110888A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0110888 A1 20010215; AU 5125300 A 20010305; AU 765983 B2 20031009; CA 2373814 A1 20010215; EP 1181306 A1 20020227; EP 1181306 A4 20030618; JP 2003506071 A 20030218

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071122

2005-03-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050203

2003-06-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 1/00 A

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 1/13 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 1/14 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/00 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12P 21/00 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 12P 21/02 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/47 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/50 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/53 B

2002-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011127

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE