Global Patent Index - EP 1181468 B1

EP 1181468 B1 2002-09-11 - SCISSORS-TYPE LIFT TABLE

Title (en)

SCISSORS-TYPE LIFT TABLE

Title (de)

SCHERENHUBTISCH

Title (fr)

PLATE-FORME ELEVATRICE A CISEAUX

Publication

EP 1181468 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00925204 A

Priority

  • DE 19921435 A
  • DE 10001910 A
  • EP 0003242 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0068597A1] The invention relates to a scissors-like lift table with a pair of scissors that is arranged between a support device (10) and a base unit (11). Said pair of scissors is provided with two pairs of limbs (1, 2) which can be pivoted about an axle (6) pertaining to the scissors and in relation to one another. The scissors-like lift table also comprises a lifting device which is provided with a lifting vehicle (3) that can be moved to and fro by means of a drive device (12) in order to open and close the scissors. The aim of the invention is to efficiently control the lifting movement. The band-shaped traction mechanism (4) can be wound-up on the roller (5) by means of the drive device (12) and by drawing the lifting vehicle (3) towards the axle (6) of the scissors in order to open the scissors and can be unwound from the roller (5) away from the axle (6) of the scissors by means of the movement force of the lifting vehicle (3) in order to close the scissors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16H 21/10; B66F 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 7/06 (2006.01); F16H 19/02 (2006.01); F16H 21/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 7/065 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0068597 A1 20001116; AT 224021 T 20020915; EP 1181468 A1 20020227; EP 1181468 B1 20020911; ES 2180520 T3 20030216; JP 2002544095 A 20021224; US 6814188 B1 20041109

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180328

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170503

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-06-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140508 AND 20140514

2014-05-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: FLEXLIFT HUBGERATE GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20140422

2014-05-09 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: FLEXLIFT HUBGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20140505

2014-03-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: FLEXLIFT HUBGERAETE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20140326

2014-03-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: ECKENDORFER STRASSE 115-117,D-33690 BIELEFELD

- Effective date: 20140326

2014-03-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: FLEXLIFT HUBGERAETE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20140326

2013-12-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FLEXLIFT-HUBGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GEISLER GMBH & CO.,KG, 49328 MELLE, DE

- Document: DE 50000505

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-12-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50000505

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE THIELKING & ELBERTZHAGEN, DE

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-12-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50000505

- Representative's name: THIELKING & ELBERTZHAGEN PATENTANWAELTE PARTNE, DE

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-12-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50000505

- Representative's name: THIELKING & ELBERTZHAGEN PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20131031

2007-04-25 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20070310

2005-08-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GEISLER GMBH & CO. KG

2004-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2003-08-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HHT HEBETECHNIK GMBH

- Effective date: 20030610

2003-08-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FLEXLIFT HUBGERAETE GMBH

- Effective date: 20030610

2003-08-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HHT HEBETECHNIK GMBH

- Effective date: 20030610

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1181468E

2003-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-12 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030412

2003-04-12 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030412

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2180520 T3

2003-02-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030107

2002-12-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000505 20021017

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224021 T 20020915

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011210

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE