Global Patent Index - EP 1181496 A4

EP 1181496 A4 2002-11-13 - CARTRIDGE AND CHARGING SYSTEM INCORPORATING SAME

Title (en)

CARTRIDGE AND CHARGING SYSTEM INCORPORATING SAME

Title (de)

KARTUSCHE UND SYSTEM ZUM LADEN DIESER KARTUSCHEN

Title (fr)

CARTOUCHE ET SYST ME DE CHARGEMENT COMPRENANT CETTE CARTOUCHE

Publication

EP 1181496 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00912261 A

Priority

  • AU 0000265 W
  • US 12746399 P
  • US 17318299 P
  • US 17506300 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0060301A1] Cartridge (10) includes first compartment (12) for holding a volume of energy absorbing stemming material (14) and adjacent second compartment (16) for holding a volume of energetic explosive or propellant material (18). Initiator (28) is disposed in compartment (16). Dividing wall (22) separates compartments (12, 16) and may be conical in shape so as to deform and seal the borehole upon detonation of material (18). Cartridge (10) may be integrally formed or assembled from two separate containers coupled together. Compartment (12) can be made from thin-walled material including one or more slits or lines of weakness to facilitate deformation or bursting. Cartridge (10) can be secured to a stemming bar for placement in the borehole. Charging systems and methods of charging a hole formed in hard material are also described and claimed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 3/02; F42B 3/00; F42B 3/26; F42D 1/08; F42D 1/16; F42D 1/20; F42D 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/02 (2006.01); F42B 3/087 (2006.01); F42B 3/22 (2006.01); F42D 1/20 (2006.01); F42D 1/22 (2006.01); F42D 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42D 1/22 (2013.01); F42B 3/02 (2013.01); F42B 3/087 (2013.01); F42D 1/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0060301 A1 20001012; AP 200102313 D0 20011231; AR 025833 A1 20021218; AU 3409200 A 20001023; CA 2373760 A1 20001012; CN 1350632 A 20020522; EA 200101029 A1 20020425; EP 1181496 A1 20020227; EP 1181496 A4 20021113; JP 2002541424 A 20021203; KR 20020016767 A 20020306

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-07 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1042741

2004-08-11 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040615

2002-11-13 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020926

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 42B 3/02 A, 7F 42B 3/00 B, 7F 42D 1/16 B, 7F 42D 1/20 B, 7F 42B 3/26 B, 7F 42D 1/08 B, 7F 42D 1/24 B

2002-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 42B 3/02 A

2002-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011031

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI