EP 1181991 A3 20040310 - Method and device for flexibly rolling a metal strip
Title (en)
Method and device for flexibly rolling a metal strip
Title (de)
Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum flexiblen Walzen eines Metallbandes
Title (fr)
Procédé et dispositif pour le laminage flexible d'une bande métallique
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 10041280 A 20000822
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP1181991A2] The metal band is rolled between two rollers, with size-variable rolling gap (4) to achieve band sections of smaller or larger thickness. To achieve a band section of smaller thickness, the contact period of each peripheral point of a first working roller (2) with the metal band (1) is shorter than the contact period of each peripheral point of a second working roller (3) with the band. This gives an asymmetrical thickness profile in the band sections with smaller thickness. The first working roller rotates at a higher speed than the second working roller.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B21B 1/22 (2006.01); B21B 13/02 (2006.01); B21B 37/26 (2006.01); B21B 13/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
B21B 37/26 (2013.01 - EP US); B21B 13/02 (2013.01 - EP US); B21B 2275/04 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [XA] DE 457669 C 19280321 - HEINRICH PANNE
- [XA] DE 2336459 A1 19740131 - NHK SPRING CO LTD
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 199 (M - 602) 26 June 1987 (1987-06-26)
- [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 104 (M - 296) 16 May 1984 (1984-05-16)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 666 (M - 1724) 15 December 1994 (1994-12-15)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1181991 A2 20020227; EP 1181991 A3 20040310; DE 10041280 A1 20020321; DE 10041280 C2 20030306; JP 2002153901 A 20020528; US 2002023472 A1 20020228; US 6662616 B2 20031216
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 01118031 A 20010725; DE 10041280 A 20000822; JP 2001251142 A 20010822; US 93445401 A 20010822