Global Patent Index - EP 1182284 A3

EP 1182284 A3 2002-09-25 - Open-end spinning device, and a procedure for taking up a thread temporarily with the help of such an open-end spinning device

Title (en)

Open-end spinning device, and a procedure for taking up a thread temporarily with the help of such an open-end spinning device

Title (de)

Offenend-Spinnvorrichtung sowie Verfahren zur vorübergehenden Aufnahme eines Fadens mit Hilfe einer derartigen Offenend-Spinnvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Métier à filer à bout libre, et procédé pour enrouler un fil temporairement à l'aide de tel métier

Publication

EP 1182284 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01117439 A

Priority

DE 10041973 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1182284A2] A thread suction tube (3) which can be moved in a working plane (Ea, EA), can be brought into a further working plane (Eb, EB) and moved within it. An Independent claim is included for corresponding equipment. Preferred features: At least two working planes (Ea, Eb) include an angle alpha between them. The resting position (3a) of the thread suction tube is near the line of intersection (S) of its two working planes (Ea, Eb). Independently of the number of working planes (Ea, Eb; EA, EB) into which the thread suction tube can be transferred, only in one single working plane is there a resting position for the thread suction tube. Working positions (3b, 3c; 3A, 3B, 3C) of the thread suction tube are so appointed, that when the tube is in its working position in a first working plane, a thread extending from a spool resting against the spool drive roller (120), crosses the operational region of the traversing thread guide, but is outside this region when the thread suction tube adopts its working position in a further working plane. The tube can be brought to more than one working position in at least one of its working planes. It is mounted on a pivoting axis. It can be displaced along this axis, which may be mounted in turn, on a further axis which is parallel to the spool drive roller.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 4/48; B65H 51/20; D01H 13/12; D01H 15/013

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 67/08 (2006.01); D01H 4/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/48 (2013.01); B65H 51/205 (2013.01); B65H 54/26 (2013.01); B65H 54/346 (2013.01); B65H 67/081 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1182284 A2 20020227; EP 1182284 A3 20020925; EP 1182284 B1 20041201; CZ 20012777 A3 20020417; DE 10041973 A1 20020307; US 2002023422 A1 20020228; US 6662542 B2 20031216

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50104668

- Effective date: 20140201

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120719

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120809

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-03-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050312

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50104668 P 20050105

2004-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT TR

2004-12-01 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT TR

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030410

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021015

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 01H 4/48 A, 7B 65H 51/20 B, 7D 01H 13/12 B, 7D 01H 15/013 B

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-02-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI