Global Patent Index - EP 1182287 B1

EP 1182287 B1 2007-10-17 - Blind stitch sewing machine

Title (en)

Blind stitch sewing machine

Title (de)

Blindstichnähvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Machine à coudre à point invisible

Publication

EP 1182287 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01120143 A

Priority

DE 10040807 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1182287A2] The loop catcher is carried in bearings to reciprocate transversely across the path of motion of the circularly-curved needle (40). The unit (14) causing relative motion between sewing head (10) and sewn material (90), is so constructed that the seam formed, runs at least approximately in the direction of the path of motion of the needle (40). Preferred features: A foot (60) holding the material down is located on the carrier (20), having a slot corresponding with needle motion. The foot is height-adjustable on the carrier. The catcher is a pin fastened to a swinging lever mounted to pivot on the carrier and connected to a drive. The needle drive is a reversible motor, geared to the needle shaft. The drive includes a timing belt running on pinions of the drive motor and needle shaft. A further version of the needle drive employs an eccentric. A cam drives the catcher and a reversible motor drive is included. The carrier translates in a frame of the sewing head, for back and forth parallel adjustment relative to the movement between sewn material and sewing head. A guide prevents undesired side motion following penetration of the material by the needle. The guide is an annular groove in a roller. The curved needle has a support contacting its convex exterior during at least part of its stroke. This is a roller on a bearing with its axis parallel to the needle curve axis, and having a groove accepting the needle. It is adjustable between a position contacting the needle, and a position avoiding it. The roller is carried on a swinging lever coupled to co-ordinate with needle motion, between these two positions. The foot and a separate cutter, have co-operating cutting edges; that on the foot being at least one of the slot edges. Foot and blade swing relative to one another about an axis perpendicular to the footplate surface. Cutter or footplate is arranged on a tube, and the complementary component is arranged on a rod passing through the tube, coupled to a drive for pivoting.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05B 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05B 1/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1182287 A2 20020227; EP 1182287 A3 20021002; EP 1182287 B1 20071017; DE 10040807 A1 20020321; DE 10040807 B4 20040715; DE 50113143 D1 20071129; US 2002035955 A1 20020328; US 6470814 B2 20021029

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50113143

- Representative's name: RAU, SCHNECK & HUEBNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSAN, DE

2015-08-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: PFAFF INDUSTRIESYSTEME UND MASCHINEN GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20150723

2015-06-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150514 AND 20150520

2015-06-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PFAFF LNDUSTRIESYSTEME UND MASCHINEN GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KSL KEILMANN SONDERMASCHINENBAU GMBH, 64653 LORSCH, DE

- Document: DE 50113143

2015-06-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50113143

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE GBR, DE

2015-06-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50113143

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

2015-06-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50113143

- Representative's name: RAU, SCHNECK & HUEBNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSAN, DE

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50113143

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE GBR, DE

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50113143

- Representative's name: SCHAUMBURG & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

2015-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50113143

- Representative's name: RAU, SCHNECK & HUEBNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSAN, DE

2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2008-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080718

2008-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080128

2007-12-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071115

2007-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50113143 P 20071129

2007-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-10-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051228

2003-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030331

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-02-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI