Global Patent Index - EP 1182342 A3

EP 1182342 A3 2002-09-11 - Two-stroke combustion engine cylinder

Title (en)

Two-stroke combustion engine cylinder

Title (de)

Zylinder für eine Zweitaktbrennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Cylindre pour un moteur à combustion interne à deux temps

Publication

EP 1182342 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01119944 A

Priority

CZ 20003046 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1182342A2] The access to the internal areas (6) of closed transfer ports (4, 4a) and their edges (11, 11a) is solved to allow the precise working and the checking of channel shape precision in the two-stroke combustion engine cylinder. This is achieved if the cylinder is arranged of the upper and lower bodies (1 and 2) while the separating plane (7) of both bodies (1 and 2) is placed between the upper edge (9) of the exhaust channel (10) and the lower edges (11) of the side closed transfer ports (4). Both bodies (1 and 2) can be connected by either a demountable method (by means of screws) or a fixed arrangement (e.g., by bonding, welding, etc.). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/18 (2006.01); F02F 1/22 (2006.01); F16J 10/00 (2006.01); F02B 75/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/22 (2013.01); F02B 2075/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1182342 A2 20020227; EP 1182342 A3 20020911; CZ 20003046 A3 20020417; CZ 292196 B6 20030813

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-07-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-02-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI