Global Patent Index - EP 1182476 B8

EP 1182476 B8 2009-02-18 - Optical multiplexing module and method of correcting optical axis thereof

Title (en)

Optical multiplexing module and method of correcting optical axis thereof

Title (de)

Optisches Multiplexer-Modul und Methode der Korrektur der optischen Achse des Moduls

Title (fr)

Module de multiplexage optique et méthode de correction de ses axes optiques

Publication

EP 1182476 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 01119834 A

Priority

  • JP 2000249627 A
  • JP 2000249628 A
  • JP 2001185811 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1182476A1] An optical multiplexing module 10 is disclosed, which is easier in adjustment of an optical axis, has an optical multiplexing element 34 and a prism 32 to change optical paths of input light. The module also has one or more input collimators 14, 16 at the input-side end thereof and a single output collimator 18 at the output-side end thereof. The optical axes of the collimators 14, 16, 18 are adjustable by optical axis adjusting means. Further, according to a method of correcting the optical axes, after fabricating the collimators 14, 16, 18 into the module 10, with an optical loss between optical parts monitored, an external force is applied in turn to a plurality of arbitrary locations around a joint portion of one optical part. This application allows a hit location 70 showing a maximum reduction in optical loss to be found out. Radiating a laser beam onto an opposite-side location 80 on the joint portion to the hit location 70 leads to an easier correction of displacements of the optical axis with ease. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/26 (2006.01); G02B 6/32 (2006.01); B23K 26/20 (2006.01); G02B 6/34 (2006.01); G02B 6/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/2706 (2013.01); G02B 6/2773 (2013.01); G02B 6/32 (2013.01); G02B 6/4237 (2013.01); G02B 6/4248 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1182476 A1 20020227; EP 1182476 B1 20081112; EP 1182476 B8 20090218; CA 2355800 A1 20020221; DE 60136513 D1 20081224; JP 2002139643 A 20020517; JP 3650591 B2 20050518; US 2002039471 A1 20020404; US 6715929 B2 20040406

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160816

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160816

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160831

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170301

2017-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170428

2017-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160816

2017-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60136513

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150812

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150811

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-10-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090813

2008-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60136513 P 20081224

2008-12-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD.

2008-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060905

2002-11-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020214

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-02-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI