Global Patent Index - EP 1182739 A3

EP 1182739 A3 2003-06-04 - High current contact

Title (en)

High current contact

Title (de)

Hochstromkontakt

Title (fr)

Contact à haute intensité

Publication

EP 1182739 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01118875 A

Priority

DE 10041516 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1182739A2] The device has a holder (7) for an electrical conductor (9) to which the connector is to be permanently fixed and a sprung plug contact (3) for connection to a counter connector (5). The holder and the plug contact consist of separate parts that are irreversibly joined together. The holder and the plug contact are made of different materials and can be riveted together.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/187; H01H 33/00; H01R 4/48; H01R 13/05; H01R 13/17; H02G 15/103

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/533 (2006.01); H01R 13/00 (2006.01); H01R 13/17 (2006.01); H01R 43/16 (2006.01); H02G 1/14 (2006.01); H02G 15/02 (2006.01); H01R 4/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/17 (2013.01); H01R 4/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1182739 A2 20020227; EP 1182739 A3 20030604; DE 10041516 A1 20020314; DE 10041516 B4 20100909; JP 2002134221 A 20020510; US 2002049005 A1 20020425

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031205

2004-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/187 A

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01H 33/00 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 4/48 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/17 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/05 B

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 02G 15/103 B

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-02-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI