Global Patent Index - EP 1182907 A3

EP 1182907 A3 2003-06-18 - Electroacoustic transducer

Title (en)

Electroacoustic transducer

Title (de)

Elektroakustischer Wandler

Title (fr)

Transducteur électro-acoustique

Publication

EP 1182907 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01307079 A

Priority

JP 2000253584 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1182907A2] Conductor pattern portions CLa1 and CLb1 are printed on a center portion of a polymeric resin film, and the center portion is folded and then bonded, thereby forming a diaphragm 21 which integrally has a flat plate-like portion 23 having the conductor pattern portions CLa1 and CLb1, and first and second vibrating sections 21a and 21b having a curved shape. A magnet 17 and yokes 18 and 19 form a magnetic circuit and a magnetic gap MG. The flat plate-like portion 23 is inserted into the magnetic gap MG. The whole diaphragm 21 is supported by a support member 20 in a floating state. In this structure, when an audio signal is supplied to the conductor pattern portions CLa1 and CLb1, the flat plate-like portion 23 is vibrated in a direction H by dynamic force generated by the magnetic field in the magnetic gap MG, and currentin the conductor pattern portions CLa1 and CLb1 which are inserted into the magnetic gap MG, and also the first and second vibrating sections 21a and 21b are vibrated in the direction H, so that a reproduced sound of excellent high-frequency characteristics is released. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 31/00; H04R 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/00 (2006.01); H04R 7/12 (2006.01); H04R 7/18 (2006.01); H04R 9/02 (2006.01); H04R 9/04 (2006.01); H04R 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 7/18 (2013.01); H04R 9/045 (2013.01); H04R 9/025 (2013.01); H04R 9/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1182907 A2 20020227; EP 1182907 A3 20030618; EP 1182907 B1 20060222; CN 1346230 A 20020424; DE 60117346 D1 20060427; DE 60117346 T2 20061012; JP 2002078079 A 20020315

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080820

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080820

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070808

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070815

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-08-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070816

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061123

2006-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60117346 P 20060427

2006-02-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-02-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040116

2004-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031209

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04R 31/00 A

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04R 9/04 B

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-02-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI