Global Patent Index - EP 1183267 A4

EP 1183267 A4 2002-09-18 - RETRO-INVERSO PEPTIDES DERIVED FROM INTERLEUKIN-6

Title (en)

RETRO-INVERSO PEPTIDES DERIVED FROM INTERLEUKIN-6

Title (de)

VOM INTERLEUKIN-6 ABGELEITETE RETRO-INVERSO PEPTIDE

Title (fr)

PEPTIDES R TRO-INVERSES D RIV S DE L'INTERLEUKINE 6

Publication

EP 1183267 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00952761 A

Priority

  • US 0040227 W
  • US 13968799 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0077033A1] Retro-inverso peptides derived from interleukin-6 (IL-6) having between 17 and about 40 amino acids and including the sequence shown in SEQ ID NO: 1. These peptides have the same activity as native IL-6 and also have neurotrophic activity. Because of the D-amino acid linkage in the peptides, they are less susceptible to proteolytic degradation <i>in vivo</i>.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/54; A61K 38/20; A61P 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/02 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); C07K 7/02 (2006.01); C07K 14/52 (2006.01); C07K 14/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/5412 (2013.01); C07K 7/02 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9503821 A1 19950209 - BRIEN JOHN S O [US]
  • [A] IHARA S ET AL.: "Identification of Interleukin-6 as a Factor That Induces Neurite Outgrowth by PC12 Cells Primed with NGF", THE JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 120, no. 5, 1996, pages 865 - 868, XP002206392
  • [A] DERETZI G ET AL.: "Suppression of chronic experimental autoimmune neuritis by nasally administered recombinant rat interleukin-6", IMMUNOLOGY, vol. 97, no. 1, May 1999 (1999-05-01), pages 69 - 76, XP002206393
  • See also references of WO 0077033A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0077033 A1 20001221; AU 6540500 A 20010102; CA 2376479 A1 20001221; EP 1183267 A1 20020306; EP 1183267 A4 20020918; IL 147094 A 20110428; IL 147094 D0 20020814; IL 190034 D0 20110801; JP 2003502343 A 20030121; JP 4786843 B2 20111005

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-10 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1042712

2004-01-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030226

2002-09-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020802

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07K 14/54 A, 7A 61K 38/20 B, 7A 61P 25/00 B

2002-03-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011214

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI