Global Patent Index - EP 1183333 A4

EP 1183333 A4 2002-09-11 - METHODS OF USING RNASE P REACTION MECHANISMS OF ACTION

Title (en)

METHODS OF USING RNASE P REACTION MECHANISMS OF ACTION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DER RNASE P REAKTION

Title (fr)

PROCEDES D'UTILISATION DES MECANISMES REACTIFS D'ACTION DE LA RNASE P

Publication

EP 1183333 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00932665 A

Priority

  • US 0013946 W
  • US 13480299 P
  • US 14004499 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0070025A1] This invention relates to a novel bacterial ribonucleoprotein complex and the component parts thereof. More specifically, this invention relates to RNase P RNA isolated from Staphylococcus aureus and the use of RNase P RNA in screens for the identification of antimicrobial compounds and to the use of such compounds in therapy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 9/00; C12N 9/16; C12N 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 38/46 (2006.01); A61K 38/55 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/04 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/02 (2006.01); A61P 13/00 (2006.01); A61P 13/02 (2006.01); A61P 13/12 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01); A61P 27/16 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); C12N 9/22 (2006.01); C12N 9/99 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); C12R 1/445 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Y 301/26006 (2013.01); C12N 9/22 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0070025 A1 20001123; EP 1183333 A1 20020306; EP 1183333 A4 20020911; JP 2002544507 A 20021224

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041229

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031006

2002-09-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020726

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC

2002-03-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011219

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE