Global Patent Index - EP 1183462 A4

EP 1183462 A4 2002-09-11 - INTEGRATED POWERTRAIN CONTROL SYSTEM FOR LARGE ENGINES

Title (en)

INTEGRATED POWERTRAIN CONTROL SYSTEM FOR LARGE ENGINES

Title (de)

INTEGRIERTES ANTRIEBSSTRANGREGELSYSTEM FÜR GROSSMOTOREN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE COMMANDE INTEGREE DE TRANSMISSION POUR GROS MOTEURS

Publication

EP 1183462 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 01926701 A

Priority

  • US 0111287 W
  • US 19507700 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0179691A1] A system (100) for controlling a vehicle powertrain is disclosed. The system includes a powertrain circuit (102) for receiving a plurality of powertrain operating signals, processing the operating signals for controlling the vehicle powertrain, and an air-intake manifold (50) fixable to an engine of the vehicle powertrain and adapted to receive the powertrain control circuit. The present invention provides a self-contained vehicle powertrain that is testable before installation into a motor vehicle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02P 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/30 (2006.01); F02M 35/104 (2006.01); F02M 35/10 (2006.01); H05K 1/11 (2006.01); H05K 1/18 (2006.01); H05K 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/10288 (2013.01); F02D 41/3005 (2013.01); F02M 35/10144 (2013.01); F02M 35/10222 (2013.01); F02M 35/10249 (2013.01); F02M 35/10301 (2013.01); F02M 35/10321 (2013.01); F02M 35/10347 (2013.01); F02M 35/104 (2013.01); F02D 2400/18 (2013.01); F05C 2225/08 (2013.01); H05K 1/118 (2013.01); H05K 1/189 (2013.01); H05K 3/0058 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE VOS G W ET AL: "MIGRATION OF POWERTRAIN ELECTRONICS TO ON-ENGINE AND ON-TRANSMISSION. THE GENERAL TREND FOR THE MOUNTING LOCATION OF POWERTRAIN ELECTRONICS REFLECTS A MIGRATION FROM PASSENGER AND ENGINE COMPARTMENTS TO ON-ENGINE AND ON-TRANSMISSION. WHILE OFFERING POTENTIAL SYSTEM-LEVEL BENEFITS, THERE ARE CHALLENG", AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEERING INTERNATIONAL, SAE INTERNATIONAL, US, vol. 107, no. 9, September 1999 (1999-09-01), pages 25 - 29, XP000860906, ISSN: 0098-2571
  • See also references of WO 0179691A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0179691 A1 20011025; EP 1183462 A1 20020306; EP 1183462 A4 20020911

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-01-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030624

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021213

2002-09-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020726

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR