Global Patent Index - EP 1183956 A3

EP 1183956 A3 2002-11-20 - System for adjusting and closing the visor of a crash helmet

Title (en)

System for adjusting and closing the visor of a crash helmet

Title (de)

Anordnung zum Befestigen und Schliessen eines Sturzhelmvisiers

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour monter et fermer la visière d'un casque de protection

Publication

EP 1183956 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01118501 A

Priority

IT MI20001927 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1183956A2] A system for adjusting and closing the visor of a crash helmet (1), the helmet comprising a chin guard (3) pivotally attached, by means of pins (4), to the side walls of the outer shell (2) of the helmet, so as to be able to be raised and lowered by turning around the axis of the pins (4), the visor being pivotally attached, by means of pins (7), to the side parts of the chin guard (3), the adjustment system comprising two adjustment devices (50) disposed respectively on the two side parts of the outer shell (2) of the helmet, each adjustment device comprising a connecting rod (51) pivotally attached, by means of a pin (52), to the visor (6), and the connecting rod (51) comprising a slot (53) which receives a pin (60) fixed to the outer shell (2) of the helmet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A42B 3/32; A42B 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/22 (2006.01); A42B 3/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/222 (2013.01); A42B 3/326 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1183956 A2 20020306; EP 1183956 A3 20021120; IT 1318797 B1 20030910; IT MI20001927 A1 20020228; IT MI20001927 D0 20000831

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040729

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030429

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 42B 3/32 A, 7A 42B 3/22 B

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI