Global Patent Index - EP 1184281 B1

EP 1184281 B1 2003-06-11 - Method an apparatus for packaging objects

Title (en)

Method an apparatus for packaging objects

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verpacken von Gegenständen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour emballer des objets

Publication

EP 1184281 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00117108 A

Priority

EP 00117108 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1184281A1] The method for fitting stretch film over palletised goods (1) comprises forming a hood (6) from the film with concertina folds in its lower edge, using vertically adjustable grippers on a frame. These are then moved sideways to apply tension to the film and open the base of the hood so that it fits over the goods and the film is stretched. The frame is then lowered over the goods so that the film is released from the grippers and stretched vertically. The novelty is that the tension of the film over the top of the goods is controlled. An Independent claim is included for a machine for carrying out the process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 9/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/135 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1184281 A1 20020306; EP 1184281 B1 20030611; AT 242720 T 20030615; DE 50002545 D1 20030717; DK 1184281 T3 20030714; ES 2194656 T3 20031201; US 2002033005 A1 20020321; US 7040076 B2 20060509

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170828

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170825

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170901

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-09-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170826

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150809

2016-05-17 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: SIGNODE INTERNATIONAL IP HOLDINGS LLC

- Effective date: 20160510

2016-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 242720 T

- Effective date: 20150809

2014-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-10-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIGNODE INTERNATIONAL IP HOLDINGS LLC, GLENVIE, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PREMARK PACKAGING LLC, GLENVIEW, ILL., US

- Document: DE 50002545

- Effective date: 20140912

2014-10-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50002545

- Representative's name: GROSSE, SCHUMACHER, KNAUER, VON HIRSCHHAUSEN, DE

- Effective date: 20140912

2014-09-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50002545

- Representative's name: GROSSE, SCHUMACHER, KNAUER VON HIRSCHHAUSEN, DE

2014-09-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PREMARK PACKAGING LLC, GLENVIEW, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LACHENMEIER A/S, SONDERBORG, DK

- Document: DE 50002545

- Effective date: 20140729

2014-09-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIGNODE INTERNATIONAL IP HOLDINGS LLC, GLENVIE, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LACHENMEIER A/S, SONDERBORG, DK

- Document: DE 50002545

- Effective date: 20140729

2014-09-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50002545

- Representative's name: GROSSE, SCHUMACHER, KNAUER VON HIRSCHHAUSEN, DE

- Effective date: 20140729

2014-09-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50002545

- Representative's name: GROSSE, SCHUMACHER, KNAUER, VON HIRSCHHAUSEN, DE

- Effective date: 20140729

2014-08-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140717 AND 20140723

2014-07-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50002545

- Representative's name: GROSSE, SCHUMACHER, KNAUER VON HIRSCHHAUSEN, DE

2014-05-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140424 AND 20140430

2011-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100809

2011-04-06 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110316

2010-04-14 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20100324

2009-12-25 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-12-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090828

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-13 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2009-09-30 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC.

- Effective date: 20090909

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080809

2009-08-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090716 AND 20090722

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090430

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070821

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070827

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-09-11 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-09-11 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-09 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030809

2003-08-09 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030809

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002545 P 20030717

2003-07-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LACHENMEIER, PER

2003-06-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: THOMSEN, FLEMMING

2003-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LACHENMEIER A/S

2002-11-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010718

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI