Global Patent Index - EP 1184327 B1

EP 1184327 B1 2003-06-25 - Magnetic lifting apparatus

Title (en)

Magnetic lifting apparatus

Title (de)

Magnetische Hebevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil de levage magnétique

Publication

EP 1184327 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 00118925 A

Priority

EP 00118925 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1184327A1] A magnetic lifting apparatus by using neodymium magnet, comprising a plurality of polarity plates (10) disposed with a predetermined interval and having non-magnetic medium (11) in the longitudinal center; a plurality of interval members (20) disposed between the polarity plates (10); a top cover (30) covering the interval members (20) and the polarity plates (10), having a hook (31) on the upper side; a plurality of neodymium magnets (40) having S/N polarity in opposite and disposed between the polarity plates (10); a plurality of rotors (50) rotated with the neodymium magnets (40) being inserted therein; a switch handle (60) for switching polarity position of the rotor (50) and the neodymium magnet (40) engaged therewith to make magnetic attraction on and off; and oxidation prevention means (70) disposed around the neodymium magnet (40), for preventing the neodymium magnet (40) from being in contact with oxygen. The present invention has an effect to prevent the neodymium magnet from being oxidized to improve magnetic performance and endurance. Further, the improved magnetic lifting apparatus of the invention minimizes a body size and its weight, guarantees simple operation and improves performance and productivity. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 1/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1184327 A1 20020306; EP 1184327 B1 20030625; DE 60003554 D1 20030731; DE 60003554 T2 20040108

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040901

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-09-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-07-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-06-30 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2003-09-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030927

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60003554 P 20030731

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-25 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2002-11-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-03-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010419

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI