Global Patent Index - EP 1184493 A3

EP 1184493 A3 2002-09-18 - Motor controlling system for individual-spindle-drive type textile machine

Title (en)

Motor controlling system for individual-spindle-drive type textile machine

Title (de)

Motorsteuerungssystem für Textilmaschinen mit Einzelspindelantrieb

Title (fr)

Système de commande des moteurs pour des machines textiles avec des broches à entraînement individuel

Publication

EP 1184493 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01115110 A

Priority

JP 2000210615 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1184493A2] The present invention relates to a motor controlling system for an individual-spindle-drive type textile machine and eliminates the need to provide each of the motor controllers with a memory backup function for set values required to control motors, the motor controllers each controlling a corresponding driving motor for each processing unit of the textile machine. Motor controllers 30 each control a corresponding one of driving motors 2, and a master controller 40 solely controls all the motor controllers 30. A microcomputer 41 of the master controller 40 has a memory 43 always retaining set values. When the master controller 40 is activated and when it receives a predetermined signal from any of the motor controllers 30, the master controller 40 transmits the corresponding set values retained in the memory 43, to the motor controller 30, which then stores the values in a memory of a microcomputer 31 (Fig. 1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/244; D01H 1/32; D01H 13/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 7/00 (2006.01); D01H 1/10 (2006.01); D01H 1/244 (2006.01); D01H 1/32 (2006.01); D01H 13/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/106 (2013.01); D01H 1/244 (2013.01); D01H 1/32 (2013.01); D01H 13/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1184493 A2 20020306; EP 1184493 A3 20020918; EP 1184493 B1 20070411; DE 60127776 D1 20070524; DE 60127776 T2 20071227; JP 2002020934 A 20020123; KR 100618450 B1 20060831; KR 20020006573 A 20020123

INPADOC legal status


2012-03-28 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20111121

2011-11-21 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 60127776

2011-11-21 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 60127776

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100625

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-03-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG

- Effective date: 20080107

2008-02-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG

- Effective date: 20080107

2007-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60127776 P 20070524

2007-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2003-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030217

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 01H 1/244 A, 7D 01H 1/32 B, 7D 01H 13/32 B

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI