Global Patent Index - EP 1184822 A3

EP 1184822 A3 2003-06-18 - Gaming and amusement machines

Title (en)

Gaming and amusement machines

Title (de)

Spiel- und Unterhaltungsautomaten

Title (fr)

Machines de jeu et d'amusement

Publication

EP 1184822 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01307408 A

Priority

GB 0021553 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2353128A] An amusement machine 300 has a reel display 346, a plurality of trails 348, 350, 352 along which a player can progress dependant upon points awarded via symbols 360 in the reel display, and a plurality of trail contribution lines 340, 342, 344 in the reel display, each contribution line contributing to a respective individual trail. The machine may include nudge and hold features 320, 322, 324 which enable a player to control the position of each reel. The machine may include a track feature 356 and secondary trail features 348', 350', 352'.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/34; G07F 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/34 (2006.01); G07F 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

GB 0021553 D0 20001018; GB 2353128 A 20010214; GB 2353128 B 20010801; EP 1184822 A2 20020306; EP 1184822 A3 20030618; NO 20014236 A 20020304; NO 20014236 D0 20010831

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-04-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07F 17/34 A

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07F 17/32 B

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI