Global Patent Index - EP 1184930 A1

EP 1184930 A1 2002-03-06 - Frequency selective surface waveguide filter

Title (en)

Frequency selective surface waveguide filter

Title (de)

Hohlleiterfilter mit frequenzselektiver Oberfläche

Title (fr)

Filtre en guide d'ondes à surface sélective en fréquence

Publication

EP 1184930 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00118658 A

Priority

EP 00118658 A

Abstract (en)

A waveguide filter is hereby presented for separating electromagnetic waves of differing wavelengths by means of transmission through, or reflection from, a two-dimensional frequency selective surface. Electromagnetic energy consisting of any arbitrary wavelength enters a section of waveguide. A two-dimensional array of thin metallic film, either self-supporting or supported by a dielectric film, is transversely located at an arbitrary cross section within the waveguide. The film consists of one or more patterns so replicated and arranged as to permit the transmission of defined wavelengths of electromagnetic energy, and to reflect other wavelengths. By this means, selected wavelengths can be separated from a broad spectrum, and transmitted further along the waveguide. This invention is not limited to any defined cross-section of waveguide, and can be applied to any arbitrary shape. This invention is also not limited to any one pattern of metallic film. Also, a multiplicity of such two-dimensional films may be located longitudinally in the waveguide to increase the filtering effect. Further, such frequency selective surfaces can be combined with coupling means to effect transmission between microstrip and waveguide structures. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7

H01P 1/207; H01P 5/107

IPC 8 full level

H01P 1/207 (2006.01); H01P 5/107 (2006.01)

CPC

H01P 1/207 (2013.01); H01P 5/107 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] US 2816271 A 19571210 - JABUS BARKER
  • [Y] US 4598262 A 19860701 - CHEN MING H [US]
  • [YA] N.G. PATERSON ET AL.: "BANDSTOP IRIS FOR RECTANGULAR WAVEGUIDE", ELECTRONICS LETTERS., vol. 12, no. 22, 28 October 1976 (1976-10-28), IEE STEVENAGE., GB, pages 592 - 594, XP002157714, ISSN: 0013-5194
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 143 (E - 322) 18 June 1985 (1985-06-18)

DCS

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

DOCDB simple family

EP 1184930 A1 20020306; EP 1184930 B1 20071128; AT 379852 T 20071215; DE 60037247 D1 20080110; DE 60037247 T2 20081127; ES 2296589 T3 20080501