Global Patent Index - EP 1185387 B1

EP 1185387 B1 2002-12-11 - METHOD FOR CONTINUOUSLY CASTING BETWEEN TWO ROLLS AUSTENITIC STAINLESS STEEL STRIPS WITH EXCELLENT SURFACE QUALITY AND RESULTING STRIPS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONTINUOUSLY CASTING BETWEEN TWO ROLLS AUSTENITIC STAINLESS STEEL STRIPS WITH EXCELLENT SURFACE QUALITY AND RESULTING STRIPS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM STRANGGIESSEN ZWISCHEN ZYLINDERN VON AUSTENITISCHEN ROSTFREIEN STAHLBÄNDERN HOHER OBERFLÄCHENQUALITÄT UND DIE SO HERGESTELLTEN BÄNDER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE COULEE CONTINUE ENTRE CYLINDRES DE BANDES D'ACIER INOXYDABLE AUSTENTIQUE D'EXCELLENTE QUALITE DE SURFACE, ET BANDES ANSI OBTENUES

Publication

EP 1185387 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 00915237 A

Priority

  • FR 0000780 W
  • FR 9905052 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2792560A1] Stainless austenitic steel strips of thickness not greater than 10 mm are produced by continuous casting of molten metal between two cooled, rotating rolls having surface comprising contacting circular or elliptical pits of diameter 100-1500 microns and depth 20-150 microns . Inert gas soluble in the steel surrounds the meniscus of the molten metal. The molten metal comprises (in weight %) C% <= 0.08, Si% <= 1, P% <= 0.04, Mn% <= 2, Cr 17-20%, Ni% 8-10.5, S% 0.007-0.040, and Fe and production impurities the remainder. The ratio Creq/Nieq = 1.55-1.9, preferably 1.70-1.90, where Creq(%) = Cr% + 1.37 Mo% + 1.5 Si% + 2 Nb% + 3 Ti% Nieq(%) = Ni% + 0.31 Mn% + 22 C% + 14.2 N% + Cu%. The inert gas surrounding the meniscus of the molten metal is a gas that is soluble in the steel or a mixture of gases, or contains at least 50 volume % of such a gas or such a mixture of gases. The inert gas is preferably comprises a mixture of nitrogen (50-100 volume %) and argon (50-0 volume %). An Independent claim is given for a stainless austenitic steel strip of thickness 10 mm or less that can be obtained by the above process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/06; C22C 38/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/06 (2006.01); B22D 11/117 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/40 (2006.01); C22C 38/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/0651 (2013.01); B22D 11/002 (2013.01); B22D 11/0622 (2013.01); B22D 11/0697 (2013.01); C22C 38/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2792560 A1 20001027; FR 2792560 B1 20010601; AT 229391 T 20021215; AU 3661800 A 20001110; AU 767990 B2 20031127; BR 0009894 A 20020115; CN 1187148 C 20050202; CN 1351528 A 20020529; CZ 20013776 A3 20020313; CZ 296650 B6 20060517; DE 60000997 D1 20030123; DE 60000997 T2 20030717; DK 1185387 T3 20030324; EP 1185387 A1 20020313; EP 1185387 B1 20021211; ES 2188523 T3 20030701; JP 2002542039 A 20021210; JP 4454868 B2 20100421; KR 100636868 B1 20061019; PL 194231 B1 20070531; PL 351566 A1 20030505; PT 1185387 E 20030430; RU 2239518 C2 20041110; SI 1185387 T1 20030430; SK 14602001 A3 20020509; SK 286180 B6 20080407; TR 200103014 T2 20020321; TW 434058 B 20010516; US 6739383 B1 20040525; WO 0064612 A1 20001102; ZA 200108666 B 20040630

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120412

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120413

2013-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-10-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131030

2013-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120412

2013-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121012

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120413

2013-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121102

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20121228

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120412

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120412

2013-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120412

2013-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120412

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-23 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20030400877

- Effective date: 20121102

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121228

2013-01-16 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120412

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 229391 T

- Effective date: 20120412

2012-12-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-11-19 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2012-11-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121101

2012-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *USINOR

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-10-19 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20121012

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110420

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110411

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110406

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110412

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110328

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110412

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110420

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110426

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110518

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20110407

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110412

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20110412

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110412

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20110310

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20110415

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188523 T3

2003-05-26 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20021211

2003-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030303

2003-04-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030400877

2003-04-12 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030412

2003-04-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-03-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-02-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030120

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000997 20030123

2003-01-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20011016;SI PAYMENT 20001016

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 229391 T 20021215

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011016

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 20011016;SI PAYMENT 20001016