Global Patent Index - EP 1185775 B1

EP 1185775 B1 2002-11-13 - COOLED PISTON FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

COOLED PISTON FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

GEKÜHLTER KOLBEN FÜR VERBRENNUNGSMOTOREN

Title (fr)

PISTON REFROIDI POUR MOTEUR THERMIQUE

Publication

EP 1185775 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00940175 A

Priority

  • DE 0001456 W
  • DE 19926567 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19926567A1] The invention relates to a cooled piston for internal combustion engines. The inventive piston is provided with an annular cooling channel on the periphery of the piston head. Said cooling channel, at its end that is open towards the piston shaft, is closed by a correspondingly shaped wall part that is radially split at least once. The aim of the invention is to improve the supply of cooling oil in the cooling channel. To this end, the wall part at the end allocated to the split is provided with a respective recess and with an upturned S-bend section that serves to deflect the cooling oil jet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 3/10 (2006.01); F02F 3/00 (2006.01); F02F 3/22 (2006.01); F16J 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 3/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19926567 A1 20001214; BR 0011493 A 20020514; EP 1185775 A2 20020313; EP 1185775 B1 20021113; JP 2003502557 A 20030121; JP 4473482 B2 20100602; US 6647861 B1 20031118; WO 0077377 A2 20001221; WO 0077377 A3 20010531

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180529

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-05-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-08-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1185775E

2003-05-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021202

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000766 20021219

2002-12-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020523

2002-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011115

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE